blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1234622

EP1234622 - Method and apparatus for making an indented opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2002/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Baumann, Bernd, Dr.
Stefan-Zweig-Strasse 4
56567 Neuwied / DE
02 / Seubert, Peter
Steiermarkstrasse 46
81241 München / DE
 [2002/35]
Application number, filing date01130055.518.12.2001
[2002/35]
Priority number, dateDE200110817021.02.2001         Original published format: DE 10108170
[2002/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1234622
Date:28.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1234622
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1234622
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B21D22/04, B21D17/02
[2002/35]
CPC:
B21D22/025 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2004/44]
Former [2002/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen einer eingebuchteten Aufnahmeöffnung[2002/35]
English:Method and apparatus for making an indented opening[2002/35]
French:Procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'une ouverture à empreinte creuse[2002/35]
Examination procedure16.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
08.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2005Fee for grant paid
09.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/36]IT22.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]GB759164  (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 20 - line 90 *;
 [A]GB782090  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 3 - line 35 *;
 [A]US2835306  (FUCHS JR FRANCIS JOSEPH) [A] 1,4 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE8424004U  (WIDMANN) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 9 *;
 [A]GB770577  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 113 - page 3, line 28 *;
 [A]EP0163056  (SCHMITZ & BRILL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figures 2-5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.