Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319368

EP1319368 - Method for determining the orientation and relative position of a medical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TECMEDIC GmbH
Werftstrasse 7
45881 Gelsenkirchen / DE
[2007/22]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
TecMedic GmbH
Werftstrasse 7
45881 Gelsenkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Winkler, Wolfgang
Enzianstrasse 13
52477 Alsdorf / DE
02 / Neddermeyer, Werner
Ludwigstrasse 92
64367 Mühltal / DE
03 / Dreckmann, Mathias
Gladbeckstrasse 204
46282 Dorsten / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Mierswa, Klaus
Iridium IP
Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5
68167 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Mierswa, Klaus
Rechtsanwalt, Friedrichstr. 171
68199 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date01130800.424.12.2001
[2003/25]
Priority number, dateDE200116116012.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10161160
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319368
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1319368
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319368
Date:30.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/12, A61B19/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Orientierung und Relativposition eines medizinischen Instruments[2003/25]
English:Method for determining the orientation and relative position of a medical instrument[2003/25]
French:Méthode pour déterminer l'orientation et la position relative d'un instrument médical[2003/25]
Examination procedure10.01.2002Examination requested  [2003/25]
31.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
07.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2007Fee for grant paid
16.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.05.2007
DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
TR30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
AT24.12.2007
LU24.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY30.05.2007
DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
AT24.12.2007
LU24.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2009/33]CY30.05.2007
DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
AT24.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2009/23]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
AT24.12.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2008/48]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
BE31.12.2007
CH31.12.2007
LI31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2008/43]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
BE31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2008/33]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2008/32]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
FR25.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
IT30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
Former [2008/19]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
GB30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
GR31.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
Former [2008/10]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
IE30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
PT30.10.2007
Former [2008/09]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
NL30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
Former [2008/08]DK30.05.2007
FI30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
Former [2007/48]FI30.05.2007
SE30.08.2007
ES10.09.2007
Former [2007/47]ES10.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0728446  (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 53 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19536180  (BRAINLAB MED COMPUTERSYST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 45-57 * * column 4, lines 16-27 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 62 *;
 [A]WO9927839  (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 4-12 * * page 6, line 23 - page 8, line 14 * * page 10, lines 6-18 * * page 14, lines 6-22 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US6144875  (SCHWEIKARD ACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 59 *