Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1223437

EP1223437 - Anti-reflection coating for ultraviolet light [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73446 Oberkochen / DE
[2004/12]
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
CARL ZEISS SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGIES AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22
73446 Oberkochen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Paul, Hans-Jochen
Spenglerstrasse 23
73437 Aalen / DE
02 / Heller, Matthias
Bachstrasse 1
35644 Hohenahr / DE
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2002/29]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01130830.127.12.2001
[2002/29]
Priority number, dateDE200110101705.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10101017
[2002/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1223437
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1223437
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/11
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/10]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reflexionsminderungsbeschichtung für Ultraviolettlicht[2002/29]
English:Anti-reflection coating for ultraviolet light[2002/29]
French:Couche antiréfléchissante pour lumière ultraviolette[2002/29]
Examination procedure09.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
12.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.05.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT, SE, TR
06.05.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU
05.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
16.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5885712  (OTANI MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10,12-15 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 16; figures 1,5; tables 3,4 * [Y] 11;
 [Y]US5532871  (HASHIMOTO SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * column 11; tables 6,11 *;
 [X]US5963365  (SHIRAI TAKESHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,13 * column 2, line 3 - line 33; figures 8-11 *;
 [X]JPH11142606  (CANON KK) [X] 1,4-10,12-15;
 [E]US6472087  (OTANI MINORU [JP], et al) [E] 1,4-10,12-15 * column 4 - column 5; figures 2,5 *;
 [PX]EP1152263  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [PX] 1,4-6,12,13 * page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 44; figures 21-24 *