EP1227470 - Keyboard musical instrument equipped with key-touch regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoshi, Inoue, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01130926.7 | 27.12.2001 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20000393138 | 25.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000393138 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227470 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227470 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227470 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/34, G10C3/12 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G10C3/12 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/31] | G10H1/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tasteninstrument mit Tastgefühlsregler | [2002/31] | English: | Keyboard musical instrument equipped with key-touch regulator | [2002/31] | French: | Instrument de musique à clavier équipé d'un régulateur de sensation de toucher | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3728841 (SAITO SHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 57; figures 1-4 * [A] 10-12,17-19; | [XA]FR2495808 (CARDINALI BERNARD [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,10,12-16,19,20; | [A]US3680426 (FRY EARL E) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 58 - column 5, line 57; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE4213469 (HERMANN ULRICH DIPL MUSIKER [DE]) [A] 1-3,6,9 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 9 * * figures 1,2 * |