Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091004

EP1091004 - Simultaneous detection, identification and differentiation of Mycobacterium species using a hybridization assay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/15]Simultaneous detection, identification and differentiation of Eubacterial taxa using a hybridization assay
[2008/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.05.2011  [2011/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innogenetics N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4
9052 Ghent / BE
[2009/09]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
INNOGENETICS N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7, Box 4
9052 Gent / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Jannes, Geert
E. Van Hoorenbekelaan 23, P.O. Box 1
3010 Kessel-Lo / BE
02 / Rossau, Rudi
Wilgehoevestraat 45
2180 Ekeren / BE
03 / Van Heuverswyn, Hugo
Colmanstraat 80
9270 Kalken / BE
 [2001/15]
Application number, filing date01200042.823.06.1995
[2001/48]
Priority number, dateEP1994087010624.06.1994         Original published format: EP 94870106
EP1995087003207.04.1995         Original published format: EP 95870032
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091004
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091004
Date:18.04.2001
[2001/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091004
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Gleichzeitiger Nachweis, Identifizierung und Differenzierung von Mykobakterium Spezies unter Verwendung eines Hybridisierungs-Assays[2008/15]
English:Simultaneous detection, identification and differentiation of Mycobacterium species using a hybridization assay[2008/15]
French:Détection, identification et differentiation simultanées d'espèces de Mycobacterium a l'aide d'une technique d'hybridation[2008/15]
Former [2001/15]Gleichzeitiger Nachweis, Identifizierung und Differenzierung von Eubakterien unter Verwendung eines Hybridisierungs-Assays
Former [2001/15]Simultaneous detection, identification and differentiation of Eubacterial taxa using a hybridization assay
Former [2001/15]Détection, identification et differentiation simultanées de taxa d'eubactériales a l'aide d'une technique d'hybridation
Examination procedure08.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
05.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
08.12.2008Fee for grant paid
08.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95924923.6  / EP0769068
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
08.12.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
11.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
10.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
LU23.06.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
[2011/21]
Former [2010/47]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/07]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
MC30.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/49]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
Former [2009/38]SE25.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9304201  (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1,20,23 * page 19, line 12 - line 15 *;
 [X]EP0452596  (INNOGENETICS NV [BE]) [X] 20 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 58; claims 1,2 *;
 [D]WO9116454  (INNOGENETICS NV [BE]);
 [DX]EP0395292  (BARRY THOMAS GERARD [IE], et al) [DX] 1,2,20 * page 3, line 27 - line 52 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 18 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 28 *;
 [A]FR2683227  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [A] 1,20,23 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2651505  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) [A] 1,20,23 * page 7, line 24 - line 31 *;
 [X]  J.W. VAN DER GIESSEN ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY, READING GB, (1994), vol. 140, no. 5, pages 1103 - 1108, XP002160258 [X] 1,4,20,23 * the whole document *
 [X]  Y. JI ET AL, MICROBIOLOGY, READING GB, (1994), vol. 140, no. 1, pages 123 - 132, XP002160259 [X] 1,4,20 * the whole document *
 [DX]  R. FROTHINGHAM ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, BALTIMORE US, (1993), vol. 175, no. 10, pages 2818 - 2825, XP002160260 [DX] 1,3,5,12,20,23 * the whole document *
 [X]  R. FROTHINGHAM ET AL., JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, CHICAGO US, (1994), vol. 169, no. 2, pages 305 - 312, XP002160261 [X] 1-5,7,13,16,20 * the whole document *
 [X]  Y. SUZUKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, BALTIMORE US, (1988), vol. 170, no. 6, pages 2886 - 2889, XP002160262 [X] 1,2,20 * the whole document *
 [DX]  K.E. KEMPSELL ET AL., JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, LONDON GB, (1992), vol. 138, no. 8, pages 1717 - 1727, XP002160263 [DX] 1,2,20 * the whole document *
 [A]  T.M. SCHMIDT, METHODS IN MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (1994), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 3 - 12, XP002160264 [A] 20 * the whole document *