Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236753

EP1236753 - Environmentally degradable polymeric compounds, their preparation and use as hot melt adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2005  [2005/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hycail B.V.
Industrieweg 24-1
9804 TG Noordhorn / NL
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Lewis, David Neal
Buitensingel 128
9883 SL Oldenhove / NL
02 / Schutte, Gerrit
Loorlaan 5
7773 AL Hardenberg / NL
03 / Westerhof, Henk
Warrewei 31
8406 AD Tijnje / NL
04 / Janssen, Jane
Sternenveld 18
7827 TL Emmen / NL
05 / Kelly, William E.
Westerstukken 35
9761 LJ Eelde / NL
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2002/36]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01200800.902.03.2001
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236753
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/08, C08G63/78, C08L67/04, C08L67/02
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Bioabbaubare Polymere, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verwendung als Schmelzklebstoff[2002/36]
English:Environmentally degradable polymeric compounds, their preparation and use as hot melt adhesive[2002/36]
French:Polymères dégradables dans l'environnement, procédé pour leur préparation et utilisation en tant qu'adhésifs thermofusibles[2002/36]
Examination procedure03.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
17.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/15]
09.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5399666  (FORD THOMAS M [US]) [X] 1-6,8,15 * column 3, lines 1-32; examples 2-4,6-9; claims 1,2,5 *;
 [X]US5028667  (MCLAIN STEPHAN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8 * example 7 *;
 [X]DE4300420  (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 3, line 62 - page 3, line 66; example 2; claims 1-3,5,6 *;
 [X]EP0765913  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 9-11 * column 14, lines 18-36 column 22, lines 10-37;; examples 13,14 *;
 [X]US5646217  (HAMMOND TIMOTHY [GB]) [X] 9-11 * example 4; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0992529  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 9-11 * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 21; claims 1,2 *
 [X]  PENCO M ET AL, "Thermal properties of a new class of block copolymers based on segments of poly(d,l-lactic-glycolic acid) and poly(@?-caprolactone)", EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL,PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD,GB, (200005), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0014-3057, pages 901 - 908, XP004189889 [X] 1-6,8 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-3057(99)00155-X