EP1238653 - Skin care products with improved skin and material softness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON GmbH Kaiserswerther Strasse 270 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lange, Rainer Kirchstrasse 36 53608 Bad Honnef / DE | 02 /
Martens, Nicolas Messbeuel 13 53604 Bad Honnf / DE | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Wante, Dirk Paul Maria, et al Johnson and Johnson NCB European Patent Group Lenneke Marelaan 6 1932 Sint-Stevens-Woluwe / BE | [2009/29] |
Former [2002/37] | Wante, Dirk, et al Johnson & Johnson NCB, European Patent Group Lenneke Marelaan 6 1932 Sint-Stevens-Woluwe / BE | Application number, filing date | 01200879.3 | 09.03.2001 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1238653 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/50 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/602 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hautpflegemittel zur Verbesserung der Haut- und Materialweichheit | [2002/37] | English: | Skin care products with improved skin and material softness | [2002/37] | French: | Produits pour le soin de la peau servant à améliorer la souplesse de la peau et du matériel | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9921532 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 49; figures 1,2; claim 17 * * page 20, paragraph 3 * * page 24, lines 8-11 * [A] 12,13; | [XA]WO9955303 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 38, lines 3-5; claims 1,12,13,16 * [A] 12,13; | [XA]US6153208 (MCATEE DAVID MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 11, lines 27-46 * * column 20, lines 20-50 * * column 30, lines 42-45 * [A] 12,13; | [XA]US5951991 (WAGNER JULIE ANN [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 20, lines 26-55; claims 1-14 * [A] 12,13; | [X]WO0064503 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 26, line 34 - page 27, line 10 * * page 1, lines 3-8; example 3; table 3 * |