Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243307

EP1243307 - Process for the removal of organic micropollutants from fumes using a suitable homogeneous adsorbing suspension of a hydrophobic and lipophylic solid in aqueous solution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2007
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
Viale De Gasperi, 16
20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
Viale De Gasperi, 16
20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Miglio, Roberta
Via Borzighella 3
28047 Oleggio (Novara) / IT
02 / Cozzolino, Ciro
Via Fossa S. Orso 6
61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT
03 / Bassetti, Angelo
Viale A. Giuglini 4/A
61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]De Gregori, Antonella , et al
Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01201004.719.03.2001
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1243307
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/14, B01D53/10
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
Extension statesAL19.03.2001
LT19.03.2001
LV19.03.2001
MK19.03.2001
RO19.03.2001
SI19.03.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Entfernung von organischen Mikroschadstoffen aus Rauchgasen mittels einer homogenen adsorbierenden Suspension aus einem hydrophoben lipophilen Feststoff in wässriger Lösung[2002/39]
English:Process for the removal of organic micropollutants from fumes using a suitable homogeneous adsorbing suspension of a hydrophobic and lipophylic solid in aqueous solution[2002/39]
French:Procédé d'élimination de micropolluants organiques de fumées en utilisant une suspension adsorbante homogène d'un solide hydrophobe et lipophile dans une solution aqueuse[2002/39]
Examination procedure22.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
12.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/03]
28.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DY]WO9219364  (LAB SA [FR]) [DY] 1,2,10,11,21 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0261687  (UNIROYAL GOODRICH TIRE CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,10,11,21 * column 5, line 19 - column 7, line 34; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3931749  (VTM VERFAHRENSTECHNIK AG FELDB [CH]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 28 *;
 [A]US4519816  (CLARKE DONALD H [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - line 47 *;
 [A]US4956095  (ROBESON LLOYD M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 53 - line 59 *;
 [A]US4115081  (OHNO MASAYOSHI, et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *