Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1118539

EP1118539 - Pressure actuated locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.01.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2007Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
01.02.2007Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITW Limited
P.O. Box 87, Queensway, Fforestfach
Swansea SA5 4YE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
ITW Limited
P.O. Box 87, Queensway, Fforestfach
Swansea SA5 4YE / GB
Former [2001/30]For all designated states
Crisp, David John
77 Eleanor Road
London E8 1DN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Crisp, David John
77 Eleanor Road
London E8 1DN / GB
 [2003/28]
Former [2001/30]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/30]Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date01201483.318.06.1997
[2001/30]
Priority number, dateGB1996001268818.06.1996         Original published format: GB 9612688
GB1997000304114.02.1997         Original published format: GB 9703041
[2001/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1118539
Date:25.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1118539
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B64D17/56, E05B51/02
[2001/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/30]
TitleGerman:Druckbetätigte Verriegelungsvorrichtung[2001/30]
English:Pressure actuated locking device[2001/30]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage à pression[2001/30]
Examination procedure12.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/09]
19.01.2007Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/09]
Appeal following examination11.04.2005Appeal received No.  T0831/05
15.06.2005Statement of grounds filed
17.01.2007Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
14.02.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97926152.6  / EP0906220
Divisional application(s)EP02077615.9  / EP1247740
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]US3981302  (VEIT HERBERT F) [A] 1-4,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5421177  (SIEBER HEINRICH [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3690605  (JONES LEON) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 9 *