Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256376

EP1256376 - Treatment vessel comprising a conditioning element and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avantium International B.V.
Zekeringstraat 29
1014 BV Amsterdam / NL
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Bracht, Maarten
165, Borneokade
1019 XD Amsterdam / NL
02 / Van den Brink, Peter John
22, Rijsenburgselaan
3972 EJ Driebergen / NL
 [2003/05]
Former [2002/46]01 / Bracht, Maarten
165, Borneokade
1019 XD Amsterdam / NL
Representative(s)Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Former [2002/46]Bakkum, Ruben Joseph
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date01201738.011.05.2001
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1256376
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, B01J8/00, B01J8/02
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/46]
TitleGerman:Aufbereitungselement enthaltendes Behandlungsgefäss und dessen Verwendung[2002/46]
English:Treatment vessel comprising a conditioning element and use thereof[2002/46]
French:Récipient de traitement comportant un élément conditionneur et son utilisation[2002/46]
Examination procedure15.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
26.11.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE128246  (HOEGER W) [X] 1-11,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5453256  (RUMPF GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [X]  DEROUANE ET AL. (EDS.), Combinatorial Catalysis and High Throughput Catalyst Design and Testing, DORDRECHT , NL, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, XP002179589 [X] 1-12 * page 266; figure 14 * * page 368; figure 3 *
 [X]  VAN GIEZEN, Chapter 3: Effect of water on the combustion of methane on supported palladium catalysts, PHD THESIS: THE CATALYTIC COMBUSTION OF METHANE, XP002179590 [X] 1-13 * page 35, paragraph 2.2 - page 36 *