Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1155958 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1155958



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 879
10.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.03.2015 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.03.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
24.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.02.2015 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
24.02.2015 French translation of claims Opposition 2
24.02.2015 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
24.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
05.12.2014 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
05.12.2014 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
05.12.2014 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
05.12.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.11.2014 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.11.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.11.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.10.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.10.2014 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2014 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 30
24.10.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.10.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.05.2014 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2014 Description Appeal 2
21.05.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
21.05.2014 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
12.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Claims Appeal 1
16.04.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.04.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
14.04.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.04.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
11.04.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.04.2014 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.04.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
04.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.03.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.02.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.02.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.02.2014 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
21.02.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Appeal 1
06.06.2013 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
17.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.04.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
11.04.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
27.02.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.02.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 19
09.01.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.12.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Claims Appeal 1
21.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
16.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
07.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
20.09.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
19.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.08.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
22.08.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 12
06.07.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.07.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
06.07.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.06.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 5
14.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.06.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
12.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
12.05.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
11.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 19
01.02.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
01.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.06.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
11.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
07.12.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
03.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
03.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
03.12.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
30.11.2009 Claims Opposition 1
30.11.2009 Claims Opposition 1
30.11.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
25.11.2009 Claims Opposition 2
25.11.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
05.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.10.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.09.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.06.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.05.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.05.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.05.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
20.05.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
19.05.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.05.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.05.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
01.05.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
27.04.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.04.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.04.2009 Request for a change of address - opponent Opposition 30
17.07.2008 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 5
16.07.2008 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
04.07.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.06.2008 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
25.06.2008 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.06.2008 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
06.06.2008 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
30.05.2008 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2008 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
03.04.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 2
27.03.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
15.10.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.10.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
08.08.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
08.08.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.08.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 4
02.06.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.05.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
25.01.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.01.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Description Search / examination 2
05.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.11.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.06.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
23.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
21.02.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.11.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.10.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 15
06.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 17
23.05.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.2001 Description Search / examination 3
23.05.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.05.2001 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
18.05.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
18.05.2001 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 9