Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1267372

EP1267372 - Integrated lighting units to be mounted on signalling and control devices for electric control boards and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Power Controls Italia S.p.a.
Via Tortona 27
I-20144 Milan / IT
[2002/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Falchi, Fiorino
Via San Giorgio 15
10090 Sangano (Torino) / IT
02 / Belluzzo, Remo
Piazza Republica 9
10090 Rivoli (Torino) / IT
03 / Nazzari, Davide
Via Monte Cervino 119
30020 Marcon (Venezia) / IT
04 / Bau', Danilo
Via Gramsci 7
10064 Pinerolo(Torino) / IT
 [2002/51]
Representative(s)De Ros, Alberto , et al
Dragotti & Associati srl
Via Marina, 6
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]De Ros, Alberto , et al
Dragotti & Associati srl Via Turati, 32
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2002/51]De Ros, Alberto (IT) , et al
Dragotti & Associati SRL Galleria San Babila 4/c
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01202316.415.06.2001
[2002/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1267372
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01H13/02, H01H9/16
[2002/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/37]
Former [2002/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integrierte Beleuchtungseinheiten zur Befestigung an Signal- und Steuervorrichtungen für elektrische Steuerpults und dergleichen[2002/51]
English:Integrated lighting units to be mounted on signalling and control devices for electric control boards and the like[2002/51]
French:Unités d'éclairage intégrées pour être montées avec des dispositifs de signalisation et commande pour tableaux de commande électrique et similaires[2002/51]
Examination procedure19.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
16.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
30.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4851623  (HONDA SUEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 10, line 21 - line 60; figures 11-13 *;
 [A]EP0789229  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19936195  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 52 - line 63 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 9; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]US5636729  (WICIEL RICHARD [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph L; figure - *;
 [A]EP1037223  (JORCZAK ALAN D [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 15 - line 26; figures 13A,13B *;
 [A]US4885443  (SIMCOE STEVEN B [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 7, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US5391848  (MURPHY JAMES L [US])