Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1175082

EP1175082 - Document scanning system with dockable platen flatbed providing sheet fed and platen scanning functions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/04]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Westcott, Robert M.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Maysick, Randall R.
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2002/04]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/04]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01202587.005.07.2001
[2002/04]
Priority number, dateUS2000061873918.07.2000         Original published format: US 618739
[2002/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1175082
Date:23.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1175082
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/04, H04N1/00
[2002/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/24]
Former [2002/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dokumentabtastsystem mit koppelbare Flachbettplatte, die Blattzufuhr- und Aufplatteabtastfunktionen zur Verfügung stellt[2002/04]
English:Document scanning system with dockable platen flatbed providing sheet fed and platen scanning functions[2002/04]
French:Système de balayage de document avec plaque à champ plat ancrable qui permet des fonctions de balayage par avancement de feuilles et de balayage sur plaque[2002/04]
Examination procedure28.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0840494  (PFU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figure - * [A] 8;
 [YA]DE29814558U  (PLUSTEK INC [TW]) [Y] 1-7 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 34; figures 1,2,11 * [A] 8;
 [A]US5881351  (SHIMOTOSO TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 3-7 * figures 1,2 *