Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182461

EP1182461 - Sensor for the detection of the direction of a magnetic field [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melexis Technologies NV
Transportstraat 1
3980 Tessenderlo / BE
[2019/41]
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Melexis Technologies NV
Transportstraat 1
3980 Tessenderlo / BE
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Melexis Tessenderlo NV
Transportstraat 1
3980 Tessenderlo / BE
Former [2007/22]For all designated states
Melexis Technologies SA
Chemin de Buchaux 38
2022 Bevaix / CH
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
SENTRON AG
Baarerstrasse 73
6300 Zug / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Popovic, Radivoje
Chemin de Champagne 21
1025 St-Sulpice / CH
02 / Racz, Robert
Bleichistrasse 9
6300 Zug / CH
03 / Schott, Christian
Avenue du Delay 4
1110 Morges / CH
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Hohgardt, Martin , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Breite Strasse 27
40213 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2002/09]Falk, Urs, Dr.
Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk, Eichholzweg 9A
6312 Steinhausen / CH
Application number, filing date01202840.324.07.2001
[2002/09]
Priority number, dateCH2000164521.08.2000         Original published format: CH 20001645
[2002/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182461
Date:27.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1182461
Date:21.01.2009
[2009/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182461
Date:28.04.2010
Language:DE
[2010/17]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1182461
Date:16.06.2010
[2010/24]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1182461
Date:09.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/07, G01D5/14
[2012/18]
Former International [2002/09]G01R33/07
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2019/41]
Former [2002/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sensor für die Detektion der Richtung eines Magnetfeldes[2002/09]
English:Sensor for the detection of the direction of a magnetic field[2002/09]
French:Capteur pour la détection de la direction d'un champs magnétique[2002/09]
Examination procedure31.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/20]
09.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2010Fee for grant paid
09.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.01.2011  08.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ams AG
Schloss Premstätten
Tobelbader Strasse 30
8141 Premstätten / AT
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [2018/52]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2011  08.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ams AG
Schloss Premstätten
Tobelbader Strasse 30
8141 Unterpremstätten / AT
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
Former [2013/04]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2011  08.02.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ams AG
Schloss Premstätten
Tobelbader Strasse 30
8141 Unterpremstätten / AT
Opponent's representative
Brand, Martin G.
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2011/10]
Opponent(s)01  28.01.2011   
austriamicrosystems AG
Schloss Premstätten
8141 Unterpremstätten / AT
Opponent's representative
Brand, Martin G.
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55
80339 München / DE
07.03.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
25.04.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.08.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
02.09.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition01.06.2012Appeal received No.  T1521/12
26.11.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
26.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
IT28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
TR28.04.2010
AT24.07.2010
LU24.07.2010
GR29.07.2010
BE31.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
[2015/21]
Former [2011/31]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
IT28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
BE31.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/20]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
IT28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/14]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
IT28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/11]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/08]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
PT30.08.2010
Former [2011/07]CY28.04.2010
DK28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
IE28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2011/05]CY28.04.2010
FI28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2011/01]FI28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
GR29.07.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2010/50]FI28.04.2010
NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2010/49]NL28.04.2010
SE28.04.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2010/46]NL28.04.2010
ES08.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL28.04.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6084401  (PALMA RODOLFO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 1-5;
 [YX]DE19956361  (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 38 * [X] 6-10;
 [Y]US5880586  (DUKART ANTON [DE], et al) [Y] 5,8 * column 3, line 34 *;
 [Y]EP0131405  (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD [GB]) [Y] 9 * abstract *;
 [Y]US3663843  (SMITH DAVID L) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 26 - line 30 *
by applicantUS6084401
 DE19956361
 US5880586
OppositionWO9854547
 US5041780
 US5883567
 GB2344424
 DE19817356
 EP0772046
 EP0947846
 US5572058