Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1182461 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1182461



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 944
12.09.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
12.09.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.09.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
02.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
02.09.2019 Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.09.2019 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
02.09.2019 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
02.09.2019 French translation of claims Opposition 3
02.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.08.2019 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
14.08.2019 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 17
14.08.2019 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 17
14.08.2019 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 12
19.07.2019 F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties Appeal 1
19.07.2019 F3033.1 Forwarding decision correcting errors to the parties Appeal 1
16.07.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 3
05.04.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 24
18.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.11.2018 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 4
30.11.2018 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 4
30.11.2018 Description submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 3
30.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.11.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.11.2018 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
27.11.2018 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
26.11.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.11.2018 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 2
30.10.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
24.10.2018 Claims Appeal 5
24.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.10.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 14
28.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
16.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
16.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
10.08.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.08.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.10.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.10.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
04.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
06.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 4
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 4
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 4
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 5
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 4
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
30.07.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 38
30.07.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
30.07.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 38
21.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
14.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
24.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 4
24.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.04.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
01.05.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
06.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
24.05.2013 Claims Appeal 2
24.05.2013 Claims Appeal 3
24.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 20
24.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
15.01.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
21.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
12.12.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
25.10.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.09.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.08.2012 Claims Appeal 2
28.08.2012 Claims Appeal 3
28.08.2012 Claims Appeal 2
28.08.2012 Claims Appeal 2
28.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.08.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 32
10.07.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.07.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.06.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.06.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
25.04.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 9
25.04.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
25.04.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.04.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 19
25.04.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
25.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.04.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
27.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 2
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 3
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 5
27.01.2012 Claims Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
27.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
27.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
23.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
17.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Request for change of name of the applicant Opposition 1
10.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.12.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
05.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 4
01.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
11.11.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.07.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
07.03.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.03.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.02.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
28.01.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.01.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.01.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
11.05.2010 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
04.05.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
01.04.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.03.2010 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
16.03.2010 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
16.03.2010 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
09.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.03.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
09.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.01.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.01.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.01.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
07.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
07.07.2009 Description Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
09.03.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
22.12.2008 European search report Search / examination 4
23.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.06.2008 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
27.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.03.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.04.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.04.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
17.12.2002 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
16.01.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
24.07.2001 Description Search / examination 8
24.07.2001 Drawings Search / examination 3
24.07.2001 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Priority document Search / examination 18
24.07.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6