Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161914

EP1161914 - Method for washing the skin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INCLINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
P.O. Box 4848 Incline Village
Nevada 89450 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
INCLINE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
P.O. Box 4848
Incline Village, Nevada 89450 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Skewes, Susan
21 N. Edgewood Road
Niantic, Connecticut 06357 / US
02 / Raddatz, Russell E.
2935 Scenic Drive
Columbia, South Carolina 29201 / US
 [2002/12]
Former [2001/50]01 / Skewes, Susan
10 Old Barry Road
Quaker Hill, Connecticut 06375 / US
02 / Raddatz, Russell E.
3423 Sunset Drive
West Columbia, South Carolina 29169 / US
Representative(s)Abello, Michel
Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Abello, Michel
Cabinet Peuscet, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01202875.924.02.1995
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateUS1994020323028.02.1994         Original published format: US 203230
US1994026696327.06.1994         Original published format: US 266963
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161914
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47K7/03, A61K7/50
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   MC,   NL,   SE [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren für das Waschen der Haut[2001/50]
English:Method for washing the skin[2001/50]
French:Procédé de nettoyage de la peau[2001/50]
Examination procedure27.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
11.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
28.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/33]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95911925.6  / EP0748242
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200309   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5256417  (KOLTISKO BERNARD M [US]) [A] 1-6,9,10,12-15 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 14 *;
 [A]US4343403  (DANIELS WILEY E, et al) [A] 1-6,9,10,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2163947  (LEMPRIERE NOEL DOUGLAS) [A] 1,5,6,12,14 * the whole document *