Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1205878

EP1205878 - Estimating noise for a digital image utilizing updated statistics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.2013  [2013/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[2012/26]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Former [2002/20]For all designated states
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gindele, Edward Brooks
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Serrano, Navid
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
 [2012/26]
Former [2002/20]01 / Gindele, Edward Brooks
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
02 / Serrano, Navid
Eastman Kodak Company, 343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US
Representative(s)Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/13]Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2012/26]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2003/37]Weber, Etienne Nicolas , et al
Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Former [2002/20]Parent, Yves , et al
KODAK INDUSTRIE, Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle
71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01204221.402.11.2001
[2002/20]
Priority number, dateUS2000071236514.11.2000         Original published format: US 712365
[2002/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1205878
Date:15.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1205878
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1205878
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00, G06K9/40, H04N1/409
[2012/06]
Former International [2003/24]G06T5/00, G06T5/20, H04N1/409
Former International [2002/20]G06T5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/10]
Former [2002/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rauschabschätzung für ein digitales Bild unter Verwendung aktualisierter Statistiken[2002/20]
English:Estimating noise for a digital image utilizing updated statistics[2002/20]
French:Estimation de bruit pour un image numérique en utilisant des statistiques actualisées[2002/20]
Examination procedure12.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
13.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2012Fee for grant paid
16.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2009
Opposition(s)28.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[DA]US6069982  (REUMAN STEVEN R [US]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 9 *;
 [DA]US6118906  (KEYES MICHAEL P [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 43 * * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 26 *;
 [A]US5963271  (IKEDA EIICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 9 *
 [A]  CHEHDI K, "Automatic identification of noises for an optimal filtering", COMMUNICATIONS, COMPUTERS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1993., IEEE PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON VICTORIA, BC, CANADA 19-21 MAY 1993, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19930519), ISBN 0-7803-0971-5, pages 474 - 477, XP010141754 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACRIM.1993.407318