EP1217677 - Fluid distribution system for solid oxide fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keegan, Kevin Richard 16 Bennett Road Hilton, NY 14468 / US | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01204712.2 | 06.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | US20000747752 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: US 747752 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217677 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1217677 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24, H01M8/04 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
H01M8/0258 (EP);
H01M8/026 (US);
H01M8/0265 (EP,US);
H01M8/2432 (EP);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/43] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fluidverteilungssystem für Festoxidbrennstoffzellen | [2002/26] | English: | Fluid distribution system for solid oxide fuel cells | [2002/26] | French: | Système de distribution de fluides pour piles à combustible à oxydes solides | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 19.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 29.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 14.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0442473 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1,16-20,24 * column 4, line 19 - line 54 * * column 2, line 15 - line 49 * * figures 1,5,8 *; | [X]US5300370 (WASHINGTON KIRK B [CA], et al) [X] 1,16-20,24 * figure 5 * * column 9, line 40 - line 62 * * column 11, line 27 - column 12, line 16 *; | [X]JPH07153472 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,16-20,24 * abstract *; | [X]WO9742672 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1,15-20,24 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 8 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 2 * * page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 21 *; | [X]JPH11297341 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [X] 1,2,16-24 * abstract *; | [A]EP0959511 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-24* the whole document * | by applicant | JPH07153472 | WO9742672 | JPH11297341 |