Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318537

EP1318537 - Set of electrical units for controlling power units [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.12.2007  [2007/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS
89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2006/52]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SAS
89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Jacq, Joel
39, rue de la Friche
95520 Osny / FR
02 / Lima, Manuel
45, rue du Maréchal Joffre
95110 Sannois / FR
 [2003/24]
Application number, filing date01204964.907.12.2001
[2003/24]
Priority number, dateFR2000001662518.12.2000         Original published format: FR 0016625
[2003/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318537
Date:11.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318537
Date:27.12.2006
Language:FR
[2006/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01H73/00, H01H51/00
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [2004/10]
Former [2003/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Einheit von elektrischen Vorrichtungen zur Steuerung von Leistungsvorrichtungen[2003/24]
English:Set of electrical units for controlling power units[2003/24]
French:Ensemble d'appareils électriques pour la commande d'appareils de puissance[2003/24]
Examination procedure14.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
18.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2006Fee for grant paid
02.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0774768  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2664763  (TELEMECANIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 14 *;
 [A]FR2704352  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, lines 18-37 *;
 [DA]FR2761521  (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]);
 [DA]FR2758903  (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR])