Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319687

EP1319687 - Modified polypropylene resins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATOFINA Research
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Demain, Axel
rue de Sart, 21
1457 Tourinnes-Saint-Lambert / BE
 [2003/25]
Application number, filing date01204967.217.12.2001
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319687
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10, C08K3/00
[2003/25]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modifiziertes Polypropylen[2003/25]
English:Modified polypropylene resins[2003/25]
French:Polypropylène modifié[2003/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/40]
22.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
04.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.02.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1026199  (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, lines 32-34 * * claims 1-26 *;
 [X]EP0896022  (FINA TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-7; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]US5548008  (ASANUMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-13 * example 1; claim 7 *;
 [X]WO9955942  (MERAKLON S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 13, lines 10-21; claims 1-20 *;
 [A]US5981047  (WILKIE ANDREW F [US]) [A] 1-13 * tables 1,I *