Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1149840

EP1149840 - Process for preparation of drospirenon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/44]Drospirenon (6b, 7b, 15b, 16b-Dimethylene-3-oxo-17alpha-pregn-4-ene-21, 17-carbolactone, DRSP) with less than 0,2% impurities
[2013/16]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2013Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 15.05.2013  [2013/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
[2013/20]
Former [2011/34]For all designated states
Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2007/19]For all designated states
Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2007/15]For all designated states
Bayer Schering Pharma AG
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Schering Aktiengesellschaft
Müllerstrasse 178
13353 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mohr, Jörg-Thorsten
Morgenstrasse 43a
59423 Unna / DE
02 / Nickisch, Klaus
Zescher Strasse 14
12307 Berlin / DE
 [2009/02]
Former [2002/05]01 / Mohr, Jörg-Thorsten
Morgenstasse 43a
59423 Unna / DE
02 / Nickisch, Klaus
Zescher Strasse 14
12307 Berlin / DE
Former [2001/44]01 / Mohr, Jörg-Thorsten
Zwinglistrasse 4
10556 Berlin / DE
02 / Nickisch, Klaus
Zescher Strasse 14
12307 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)König, Gregor Sebastian
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/29]König, Gregor Sebastian
König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/35]Bertucco, Alberto
Bayer Schering Pharma AG Patents & Licensing Müllerstraße 178
DE-13342 Berlin / DE
Former [2011/34](deleted)
...
Former [2011/15]Bertucco, Alberto
Bayer Schering Pharma AG Patents & Licensing Müllerstraße 178
DE-13342 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date01250277.911.08.1997
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateDE199613368512.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19633685
[2001/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1149840
Date:31.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1149840
Date:01.12.2004
[2004/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1149840
Date:07.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/02]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1149840
Date:15.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07J53/00
[2001/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/44]
Extension statesAL25.07.2001
LT25.07.2001
LV25.07.2001
RO25.07.2001
SI25.07.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Drospirenon[2013/16]
English:Process for preparation of drospirenon[2013/16]
French:Procédé de préparation de drospirenon[2013/16]
Former [2001/44]Drospirenon (6b, 7b, 15b, 16b-Dimethylene-3-oxo-17alpha-pregn-4-ene-21, 17-carbolactone, DRSP) mit weniger als 0,2% Verunreinigung
Former [2001/44]Drospirenon (6b, 7b, 15b, 16b-Dimethylene-3-oxo-17alpha-pregn-4-ene-21, 17-carbolactone, DRSP) with less than 0,2% impurities
Former [2001/44]Drospirénone (6b, 7b, 15b, 16b-Diméthylene-3-oxo-17alpha-pregn-4-ene-21, 17-carbolactone, DRSP) avec impurétés moins de 0,2%
Examination procedure25.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
04.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2008Fee for grant paid
24.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97937562.3  / EP0918791
Divisional application(s)EP09100011.7  / EP2168974
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009  26.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB
Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
 03  06.10.2009  14.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street
Petach Tikva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  30.05.2012  03.11.2011  INTERVENTION
Hexal Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestr. 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/43]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009  26.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Dr. Schön & Partner Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
 03  06.10.2009  14.09.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street
Petach Tikva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Nachshen, Neil Jacob
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 04  30.05.2012  03.11.2011  INTERVENTION
Hexal Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestr. 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2012/28]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009  26.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Dr. Schön & Partner Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
 03  06.10.2009  22.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street
Petach Tikva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
The Park, Talley Nr Llandeilo
Dyfed SA19 7YY / GB
 04  30.05.2012  03.11.2011  INTERVENTION
Hexal Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestr. 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hollatz, Christian
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2011/14]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
I-20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009  26.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Dr. Schön & Partner Bavariaring 26
80336 München / DE
 03  06.10.2009  22.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street
Petach Tikva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
The Park, Talley Nr Llandeilo
Dyfed SA19 7YY / GB
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
I-20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009  26.06.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Kroher·Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
 03  06.10.2009  22.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
5 Basel Street
Petach Tikva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
The Park, Talley Nr Llandeilo
Dyfed SA19 7YY / GB
Former [2009/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009  18.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
I-20122 Milano / IT
 02  18.06.2009   
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Schön, Christoph
Kroher.Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/13]
Opponent(s)01  23.01.2009   
Industriale Chimica s.r.l.
Via E. H. Grieg, 13
I-21047 Saronno (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
I-20122 Milano / IT
03.12.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.04.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.11.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.10.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.03.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.03.2013Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition16.12.2011Appeal received No.  T2505/11
13.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
17.10.2012Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.11.2011Appeal received No.  T2505/11
13.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
17.10.2012Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
23.12.2011Appeal received No.  T2505/11
12.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
17.10.2012Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.12.2011Appeal received No.  T2505/11
12.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
15.06.2012Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2012/24]
17.10.2012Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
17.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
18.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3626838  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1 * example 5 *;
 [X]DE2652761  (SCHERING AG) [X] 1 * example 9 *;
 [X]EP0075189  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1 * examples G,H *;
 [X]EP0051143  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 10; examples g,h *
 [X]  - NICKISCH K ET AL, "ACID CATALYZED REARRANGEMENTS OF 15-BETA 16-BETA METHYLENE-17-ALPHA-PREGNENE-21 17-CARBOLACTONE DERIVATIVES", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 45, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5463 - 5466, XP002298941 [X] 1 * page 5463, paragraph 2 - page 5464, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)85238-7
 [X]  - BITTLER D ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF SPIRORENONE - A NOVEL HIGHLY ACTIVE ALDOSTERONE ANTAGONIST", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, VERLAG CHEMIE. WEINHEIM, DE, (1982), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0570-0833, pages 696 - 697, XP002047531 [X] 1 * page 696, column 2; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.198206961
OppositionUS4416985