blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1149840


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.04.2013 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
05.04.2013 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
20.03.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
15.03.2013 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
15.03.2013 Change - German title published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
15.03.2013 Change - English title published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
15.03.2013 Change - French title published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
29.10.2012 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
29.10.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.09.2012 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
15.06.2012 Change - representative published on  18.07.2012  [2012/29]
13.06.2012 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
08.06.2012 Intervention of assumed infringer published on  11.07.2012  [2012/28]
21.04.2012 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2012 Change: Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.01.2012 New entry: Appeal number
05.01.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
20.12.2011 New entry: Appeal number
20.12.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
09.12.2011 Change: Appeal number
09.12.2011 New entry: Appeal number
09.12.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.11.2011 New entry: Appeal number
23.11.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
31.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
21.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.07.2011 Change - representative published on  31.08.2011  [2011/35]
29.07.2011 Change - representative published on  31.08.2011  [2011/35]
22.07.2011 Change - applicant published on  24.08.2011  [2011/34]
22.07.2011 Change - representative published on  24.08.2011  [2011/34]
18.03.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2011 Change - representative published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
11.03.2011 Change - representative published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
04.03.2011 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
27.04.2010 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2009 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
23.10.2009 Opposition filed published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]
26.06.2009 Opposition filed published on  29.07.2009  [2009/31]
06.03.2009 Change - divisional application(s) published on  08.04.2009  [2009/15]
20.02.2009 Opposition filed published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
05.12.2008 (Expected) grant published on  07.01.2009  [2009/02]
05.12.2008 Change - inventor published on  07.01.2009  [2009/02]
11.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.11.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.07.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.07.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.06.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2008 First examination report
31.01.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.07.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2007 Change - applicant published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
09.03.2007 Change - applicant published on  11.04.2007  [2007/15]
20.07.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  24.08.2005  [2005/34]
15.10.2004 Publication of search report published on  01.12.2004  [2004/49]
23.07.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.07.2002 Renewal fee
14.12.2001 Change - inventor published on  30.01.2002  [2002/05]
14.09.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.10.2001 [2001/44]
14.09.2001 Request for examination filed published on  31.10.2001 [2001/44]
13.08.2001 Change - extension states
13.08.2001 Renewal fee