blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1149840

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
Examination procedure24.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
15.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
18.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
European patent granted07.01.2009
Opposition procedure27.03.2013Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition16.12.2011APPEAL FILED
13.03.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
17.10.2012APPEAL RESULT
18.11.2011APPEAL FILED
13.03.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
17.10.2012APPEAL RESULT
23.12.2011APPEAL FILED
12.03.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
17.10.2012APPEAL RESULT
06.12.2011APPEAL FILED
12.03.2012APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
15.06.2012COMMUNICATION A.110(2) DISPATCHED
17.10.2012APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:31.10.2001 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:918791
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:31.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL PAYMENT 20010725;LT PAYMENT 20010725;LV PAYMENT 20010725;RO PAYMENT 20010725;SI PAYMENT 20010725
 
Event date:31.10.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010725
 
Event date:30.01.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MOHR, JOERG-THORSTEN
 
Event date:30.01.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:NICKISCH, KLAUS
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:01.12.2004 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV RO SI
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:AL
Payment DATE:20010725
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:LT
Payment DATE:20010725
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:LV
Payment DATE:20010725
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:RO
Payment DATE:20010725
 
Event date:24.08.2005 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
EXTENSION STATE:SI
Payment DATE:20010725
 
Event date:11.04.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG
 
Event date:09.05.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
 
Event date:05.03.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080204
 
Event date:21.04.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:07.01.2009 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:0918791
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:07.01.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:07.01.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV RO SI
 
Event date:07.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:15.01.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:26.02.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59712991
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20090226
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:25.03.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20090123
 
Event date:31.03.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20090320
 
Event date:27.04.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:15.05.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20090401000 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2320626 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:02.06.2009 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
 
Event date:29.07.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20090123
 
Event date:29.07.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
Effective DATE:20090618
 
Event date:01.10.2009 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
 
Event date:01.10.2009 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
 
Event date:25.11.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20090123
 
Event date:25.11.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
Effective DATE:20090618
 
Event date:25.11.2009 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
 
Event date:01.02.2010 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
 
Event date:06.04.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20090123
 
Event date:06.04.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
Effective DATE:20090618
 
Event date:06.04.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:22.04.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
 
Event date:24.08.2011 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
 
Event date:16.05.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL TD
Code Expl.: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20120508
 
Event date:08.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Effective DATE:20120502
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Free Format Text:BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178#13353 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#MUELLERSTRASSE 178#13353 BERLIN (DE)
 
Event date:02.08.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59712991 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 13353 BERLIN, DE
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:24.10.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:INDUSTRIALE CHIMICA S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20090123
 
Event date:24.10.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:LABORATORIOS LEON FARMA, S.A.
Effective DATE:20090618
 
Event date:24.10.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Effective DATE:20091006
 
Event date:15.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT HC 420098 AT T
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS
Owner Name:BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE
Effective DATE:20121018
 
Event date:07.02.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:BAYER PORTUGAL, S.A., PT
Effective DATE:20130128
 
Event date:01.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:LUSAL, PRODUCAO QUIMICO-FARMACEUTICA LUSO-ALEM, PT
Effective DATE:20130128
 
Event date:04.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT QB4A
Code Expl.: LICENCE
Name of Requester:BERLEX - ESPECIALIDADES FARMACEUTICAS, LDA. (B, PT
Effective DATE:20130128
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20130515
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV RO SI
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AELC
Code Expl.: CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM
 
Event date:01.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T4
Code Expl.: AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:04.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 59712991 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
Effective DATE:20130515
 
Event date:16.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE RPEO
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN AMENDED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO
 
Event date:08.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES GD2A
Code Expl.: CONTRACTUAL LICENCES
Effective DATE:20130808
 
Event date:28.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:05.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 2320626 ES T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
Effective DATE:20130905
 
Event date:25.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:30.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T5
Code Expl.:+CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:30.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T5
Code Expl.:+CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20130924
 
Event date:17.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20130401584 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20130920
 
Event date:23.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20160801
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20160822
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160802
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20160810
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20160726
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20160812
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20160725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20160809
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20160811
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160729
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20160727
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20160725
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20160728
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:11.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59712991 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:15.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:18.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20170810
 
Event date:30.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20170810
 
Event date:03.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:15.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 420098 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:20.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170821
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170810
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170811
 
Event date:08.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20180508
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20170812
 
Event date:15.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20170811