Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1349590

EP1349590 - AUTO-INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Change - applicantpublished on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHL Group AB
P.O. Box 1240
(Augustendalsvägen 7)
131 28 Nacka Strand / SE
[2017/47]
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
SHL Group AB
Augustendalsvägen 19
131 28 Nacka Strand / SE
Former [2003/41]For all designated states
SHL Medical AB
Kvarnholmsvägen 52
131 31 Nacka / SE
Inventor(s)01 / AMARK, Mikael
Norrbyvägen 2
S-186 97 Brottby / SE
02 / BERGENS, Thomas
Furuvägen 1
S-134 69 Ingarö / SE
 [2003/41]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/04]Stein, Jan Anders Lennart
Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [2007/30](deleted)
...
Former [2003/41]Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik , et al
Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192
104 62 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date01270353.414.12.2001
[2003/41]
WO2001SE02770
Priority number, dateSE2000000462814.12.2000         Original published format: SE 0004628
[2003/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0247746
Date:20.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1349590
Date:08.10.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2002
[2003/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1349590
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE20.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/20, A61M5/32
[2003/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOINJEKTOR[2003/41]
English:AUTO-INJECTOR[2003/41]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION AUTOMATIQUE[2003/41]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2003National basic fee paid 
02.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
02.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/41]
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2006Fee for grant paid
28.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007  05.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
De Ros, Alberto
Via Michelangelo 53
22071 Cadorago (CO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
TecPharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Opponent's representative
SSM Sandmair, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/12]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007  05.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
De Ros, Alberto
Via Michelangelo 53
22071 Cadorago (CO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al
Df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
TecPharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx, et al
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2008/52]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007  05.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
De Ros, Alberto
Via Michelangelo 53
22071 Cadorago (CO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Molnia, David, et al
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
TecPharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Wess, Wolfgang, et al
Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2008/42]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007  05.04.2007  ADMISSIBLE
De Ros, Alberto
Via Michelangelo 53
22071 Cadorago (CO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Dini, Roberto, et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100
10060 None (TO) / IT
 02  28.02.2007  08.03.2007  ADMISSIBLE
TecPharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Wess, Wolfgang, et al
Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2007/14]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007   
De Ros, Alberto
Via Michelangelo 53
22071 Cadorago (CO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Dini, Roberto, et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100
10060 None (Torino) / IT
 02  28.02.2007   
TecPharma Licensing AG
Brunnmattstrasse 6
3401 Burgdorf / CH
Opponent's representative
Wess, Wolfgang, et al
Schwabe-Sandmair-Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.04.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.01.2009Date of oral proceedings
20.03.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.03.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.12.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition16.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0378/16
02.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.05.2009Appeal received No.  T1071/09
16.07.2009Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
17.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
26.09.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.05.2006
FI31.05.2006
TR31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
LU14.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]FI31.05.2006
TR31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
LU14.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/19]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
GR01.09.2006
PT31.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/45]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/37]FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/36]FI31.05.2006
IT31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2007/12]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
PT31.10.2006
Former [2006/51]FI31.05.2006
SE31.08.2006
Former [2006/48]SE31.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]US6210369  ;
 [A]US5176643
ExaminationEP0824923
 US5137516