blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1350373 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1350373



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 4797
26.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.06.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
19.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 28
18.05.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
04.04.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
04.04.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 4
23.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
07.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
06.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
03.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
02.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
02.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
28.02.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
24.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.02.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.02.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.01.2017 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
31.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
25.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
19.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
19.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
19.01.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
13.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.01.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.10.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 8
27.10.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 16
24.10.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.08.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
21.07.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
11.04.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
09.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
07.04.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
11.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
05.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
05.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.11.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
04.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
25.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
17.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
02.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
25.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
29.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
24.07.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
01.07.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.06.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.06.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.06.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.06.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
11.06.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
24.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
15.04.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
11.04.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.04.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
08.03.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
08.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.03.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
04.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
13.02.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 54
13.02.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
13.02.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
13.02.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
13.02.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 21
13.02.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
12.02.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
12.02.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.02.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.12.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2012 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
04.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.11.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.11.2012 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 7
27.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
16.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 4
02.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
02.11.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.11.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
01.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
31.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
31.10.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 55
31.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
30.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
26.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.09.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
09.08.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.08.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 24
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.07.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
26.03.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
19.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.01.2012 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
04.01.2012 Claims Opposition 4
04.01.2012 Claims Opposition 4
04.01.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
02.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 4
27.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
27.12.2011 Claims Opposition 4
27.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 18
01.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2011 Annex Opposition 1
26.07.2011 Annex Opposition 1
26.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 29
26.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
26.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.07.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
13.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
08.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 19
01.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
11.08.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
18.05.2010 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 1
11.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.05.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
23.04.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
09.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
09.04.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.03.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
26.03.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
22.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
16.02.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
16.02.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
16.02.2010 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 27
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 188
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 58
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
16.02.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 311
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 96
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
16.02.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.12.2009 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
17.12.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
17.12.2009 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
13.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
29.12.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
29.12.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
29.12.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 126
29.12.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 29
17.04.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.04.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
17.04.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
05.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
04.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 18
31.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
31.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
31.01.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Annex Opposition 27
25.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
21.01.2008 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
21.01.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
21.01.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.01.2008 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period Opposition 2
28.12.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
13.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
13.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
31.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 22
30.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 22
25.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.10.2007 Request for documents Opposition 1
25.10.2007 Request for documents Opposition 1
24.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.10.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 64
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
05.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 41
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 88
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
05.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.10.2007 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
04.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
04.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 80
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.10.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
03.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
03.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
03.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
02.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
02.10.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 1
02.10.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.12.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.11.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
15.11.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
06.07.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.07.2006 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
28.06.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
28.06.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
07.06.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
07.06.2006 Claims Search / examination 5
07.06.2006 Description Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
10.05.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
02.11.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
02.11.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.06.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
22.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.06.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.05.2005 General enquiry Search / examination 1
07.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
07.02.2005 Description Search / examination 3
07.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
10.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.12.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.07.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.07.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2003 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2003 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
18.07.2003 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
01.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
01.07.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.07.2003 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.04.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
31.03.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
31.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
21.03.2003 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
21.03.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.02.2003 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.02.2003 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
12.02.2003 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.02.2003 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.01.2003 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.01.2003 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.10.2002 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.10.2002 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
22.10.2002 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
22.08.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.08.2002 Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 1
23.07.2002 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.07.2002 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.07.2002 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
12.07.2002 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.07.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.07.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.07.2002 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.07.2002 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
28.06.2002 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
20.06.2002 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
08.02.2002 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.02.2002 Claims International Searching Authority 4
08.02.2002 Description International Searching Authority 9
08.02.2002 Drawings International Searching Authority 4
10.12.2001 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1