blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1345740

EP1345740 - WOOD ACCELERATING DRYING PROCESS BASED ON ITS RHEOLOGICAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.03.2013  [2013/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Empresa Brasileira de Pesquisa Agropecuária - EMBRAPA
Parque Estacao Biologica Edificio Sede Plano Piloto
3o Andar CEP-70770-901 Brasilia, DF / BR
For all designated states
Ecole Nationale du Génie Rural des Eaux et Forêts - ENGREF
19, avenue du Maine
75732 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Empresa Brasileira de Pesquisa Agropecuaria - EMBRAPA
Parque Estacao Biologica Edificio Sede Plano Piloto
3o Andar CEP-70770-901 Brasilia, DF / BR
For all designated states
Ecole Nationale du Génie Rural des Eaux et Forêts - ENGREF
19, avenue du Maine
75732 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ROMEIRO DE AGUIAR, Osmar, José
Av. Tavares Bastos, 933 Bloco E, Apt. 302
Marambaia elém Do Par / BR
02 / PERRE, Patrick
14, rue Girardet
F-54042 Nancy / FR
 [2003/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01271279.020.12.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001BR00157
Priority number, dateBR2000000639920.12.2000         Original published format: BR 0006399
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0249819
Date:27.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1345740
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT27.06.2002
ClassificationIPC:B27K5/00, F26B7/00
[2003/39]
CPC:
F26B21/06 (EP,US); F26B2210/16 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHLEUNIGTES, AUF DEN RHEOLOGISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN DES HOLZES BASIERENDES VERFAHREN ZUR TROCKNUNG VON HOLZ[2003/39]
English:WOOD ACCELERATING DRYING PROCESS BASED ON ITS RHEOLOGICAL PROPERTIES[2003/39]
French:PROCEDE DE SECHAGE ACCELERE DU BOIS FONDE SUR LES PROPRIETES RHEOLOGIQUES DU BOIS[2003/39]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2002National basic fee paid 
15.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
22.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR
25.03.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/12]
23.12.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/12]
Appeal following examination02.03.2009Appeal received No.  T1231/09
04.05.2009Statement of grounds filed
12.12.2012Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.12.2006
Request for further processing for:22.08.2007Request for further processing filed
22.08.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.09.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5901463  (GUYONNET RENE [FR]);
 [AD]US5992043  (GUYONNET RENE [FR]);
 [AP]US2001015020  (UEHARA TAIRA [JP])
by applicantUS5901463
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.