Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1358634

EP1358634 - CONTROL METHOD FOR USE IN A TOLL DETERMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.03.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change - applicantpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
Compagnie Financière et Industrielle des Autoroutes S.A.
6-10, rue Troyon
92316 Sèvres Cedex / FR
[2019/48]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ET INDUSTRIELLE DES AUTOROUTES
6-10, Rue Troyon
92316 Sèvres Cedex / FR
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ET INDUSTRIELLE DES AUTOROUTES
6-10, Rue Troyon
92316 Sèvres Cedex / FR
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ET INDUSTRIELLE DES AUTOROUTES
6-10, Rue Troyon
92316 Sèvres Cedex / FR
Former [2003/45]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIET, Werner
Buchenbitze 23
53773 Hennef / DE
 [2003/45]
Representative(s)Rasch, Michael , et al
Rösler - Rasch - van der Heide & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Bodenseestrasse 18
81241 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date01273553.608.12.2001
[2003/45]
WO2001EP14439
Priority number, dateDE2001100450231.01.2001         Original published format: DE 10104502
[2003/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02061690
Date:08.08.2002
Language:DE
[2002/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1358634
Date:05.11.2003
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002
[2003/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/00
[2003/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/45]
TitleGerman:KONTROLLVERFAHREN ZUR STRASSENGEBÜHRENERFASSUNG[2003/45]
English:CONTROL METHOD FOR USE IN A TOLL DETERMINATION SYSTEM[2003/45]
French:PROCEDE DE CONTROLE POUR LA COLLECTE DE DROITS DE PEAGE[2003/45]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2003National basic fee paid 
17.07.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/45]
26.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
28.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2015Observations by third parties
01.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0595/16
01.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2006
Request for further processing for:28.03.2007Request for further processing filed
28.03.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.05.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
28.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
30.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
Cited inInternational search[X]US5757286  (ISAKSSON FOLKE ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 9, line 10 *;
 [X]US6109525  (BLOMQVIST KENNETH ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 67 * * column 5, line 46 - line 60 * * column 6, line 17 - line 43 *;
 [XD]WO9966455  (BARKER RONALD ;MANNESMANN AG (DE); WIDL ANDREAS (DE)) [XD] 2-5,8,9 * abstract * * page 8, line 21 - page 10, line 15 *;
 [Y]EP0834838  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1,3,4,6-10 * abstract * * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 29 * * column 15, line 2 - line 12 * * column 15, line 42 - column 17, line 22 * * column 18, line 56 - column 19, line 30 * * column 21, line 57 - column 22, line 18 * * column 23, line 10 - line 28 *;
 [Y]US6140941  (FEITELSON STEPHEN J ET AL) [Y] 1,3,4,6-10 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0741373  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 21 - line 23 *;
 [A]US5440109  (HERING BERNHARD ET AL)
other   - EIDGENÖSSISCHE OBERZOLLDIREKTION, "LEISTUNGSABHäNGIGE SCHWERVERKEHRSABGABE AUSSCHREIBUNG AUTOMATISCHES KONTROLLSYSTEM (ENFORCEMENTSYSTEM)", LSVA PROJECT, (19990324), XP003032047