Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1379647

EP1379647 - Antagonist antibodies of a mammalian cytokine or its receptor for the treatment of allergy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/03]MAMMALIAN CYTOKINES; RECEPTORS; RELATED REAGENTS AND METHODS
[2013/03]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[2013/23]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
Schering Corporation
Patent Department - K-6-1 1990, 2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, NJ 07033-0530 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RECHE-GALLARDO, Pedro, A.
380 Riverway,apt 3
Boston, MA 02115 / US
02 / DE WAAL MALEFYT, Rene
891 Muender Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / BAZAN, J., Fernando
426 Waverly Street, Nr. 6
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
04 / KASTELEIN, Robert, A.
463 Summit Drive
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
05 / LIU, Yong-Jun
4010 Villa Vista
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2004/03]01 / RECHE-GALLARDO, Pedro, A.
380 Riverway,apt#3
Boston, MA 02115 / US
02 / DE WAAL MALEFYT, Rene
891 Muender Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / BAZAN, J., Fernando
426 Waverly Street, Nr. 6
Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US
04 / KASTELEIN, Robert, A.
463 Summit Drive
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
05 / LIU, Yong-Jun
4010 Villa Vista
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/15]Vossius & Partner
P.O. Box 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2013/11]Horgan, James Michael Frederic
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharpe & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2008/01]Vossius & Partner
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
Former [2007/37]Naylor, Kathryn May , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2004/03]Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date01273862.109.11.2001
[2004/03]
WO2001US50351
Priority number, dateUS20000247218P10.11.2000         Original published format: US 247218 P
US20010298268P14.06.2001         Original published format: US 298268 P
[2004/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO02068646
Date:06.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1379647
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1379647
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17
[2013/04]
Former International [2004/03]C12N15/12, C07K14/54, C07K14/715, G01N33/68, C07K16/28, C07K16/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/03]
Extension statesRO12.05.2003
SI12.05.2003
TitleGerman:Antagonist Antikörper von Säugerzytokine oder deren Rezeptor zur Allergiebehandlung[2013/03]
English:Antagonist antibodies of a mammalian cytokine or its receptor for the treatment of allergy[2013/03]
French:Anticorps antagonistes de cytokines de mammifères ou leur récepteur pour le traitement d'allergie[2013/03]
Former [2004/03]SÄUGER ZYTOKINE, RECEPTOREN, VERWANDTE REAGENTIEN UND METHODEN
Former [2004/03]MAMMALIAN CYTOKINES; RECEPTORS; RELATED REAGENTS AND METHODS
Former [2004/03]CYTOKINES DE MAMMIFERES; RECEPTEURS; REACTIFS ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase12.05.2003National basic fee paid 
12.05.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.05.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
08.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.12.2012
18.12.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2013Fee for grant paid
26.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10179981.5  / EP2292760
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  02.05.2018  WITHDRAWN
Thirkettle, Linda Elke
Untere Mühlstrasse 20
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 02  12.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George
Schlich
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 03  05.03.2014  12.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. H. Ulrich Dörries
Fünf Höfe, Theatinerstr. 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 [2018/24]
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  10.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Thirkettle, Linda Elke
Untere Mühlstrasse 20
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 02  12.02.2014   
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
 03  05.03.2014   
Dr. H. Ulrich Dörries
Fünf Höfe, Theatinerstr. 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Dörries, Hans Ulrich
df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  10.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Thirkettle, Linda Elke
Untere Mühlstrasse 20
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
 02  12.02.2014   
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Schlich, George
Schlich LLP
9 St Catherine's Road
Littlehampton
Sussex BN17 5HS / GB
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014   
Thirkettle, Linda Elke
Untere Mühlstrasse 20
80999 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
14.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1958/16
15.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
26.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1958/16
31.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
30.03.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2017/13]
23.06.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/25]
09.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
AT09.11.2017
FI09.11.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
SE10.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
DK30.11.2017
PT09.05.2018
GR04.06.2018
[2018/51]
Former [2018/50]MC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
AT09.11.2017
FI09.11.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
SE10.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
PT09.05.2018
GR04.06.2018
Former [2018/45]MC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
AT09.11.2017
FI09.11.2017
IE09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
SE10.11.2017
PT09.05.2018
GR04.06.2018
Former [2018/40]MC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
AT09.11.2017
FI09.11.2017
LU09.11.2017
SE10.11.2017
PT09.05.2018
GR04.06.2018
Former [2018/36]MC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
FI09.11.2017
PT09.05.2018
Former [2017/49]MC05.06.2013
CY09.11.2016
Former [2014/33]MC05.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0017362  (SCHERING CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,16,17 * page 4, paragraph 1; figures SEQ.1-9; claims 1-19 *;
 [Y]WO9947538  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,16,17 * page 1, paragraphs 1-3; figures 1,2; claims 1-24 * * page 67, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]  - PANDEY A ET AL, "Cloning of a receptor subunit required for signaling by thymic stromal lymphopoietin.", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY. UNITED STATES JUL 2000, (200007), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 59 - 64, XP008014551 [X] 14,15,18-21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/76923
 [XDY]  - PARK LINDA S ET AL, "Cloning of the murine thymic stromal lymphopoietin (TSLP) receptor: Formation of a functional heteromeric complex requires interleukin 7 receptor", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, TOKYO, JP, (20000904), vol. 192, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 659 - 669, XP002193895 [XD] 14,15,18-21 * abstract * [Y] 1-3,16,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.192.5.659
 [X]  - LEVIN S D ET AL, "Thymic stromal lymphopoietin (TSLP): A cytokine that promotes the development of IgM+ B cells in vitro and signals via a novel mechanism.", FASEB JOURNAL, Annual Meeting of the Professional Research Scientists for Experimental Biology 99;Washington, D.C., USA; April 17-21, 1999, (19990312), vol. 13, no. 4 PART 1, ISSN 0892-6638, page A322, XP008014578 [X] 14,15,18-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HIROYAMA TAKASHI ET AL, "Molecular cloning and characterization of CRLM-2, a novel type I cytokine receptor preferentially expressed in hematopoietic cells", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20000527), vol. 272, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 224 - 229, XP002194487 [A] 1-3,16,17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2000.2764
 [A]  - FUJIO,K. ET AL., "Cytokine receptor like molecule 2 precursor. Gene name", SWALL, (20001001), Database accession no. Q9JJH8, URL: EBI, XP002233483 [A] 1-3,16,17 * the whole document *
Examination   - HE RUI ET AL, "Thymic stromal lymphopoietin", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 1183, no. 1, doi:DOI: 10.1111/J.1749-6632.2009.05128.X, ISSN 1749-6632, (20100101), pages 13 - 24, (20100112), XP008152987

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/DOI: 10.1111/j.1749-6632.2009.05128.x
    - ROAN FLORENCE ET AL, "The multiple facets of thymic stromal lymphopoietin (TSLP) during allergic inflammation and beyond", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY,, (20120601), vol. 91, no. 6, ISSN 1938-3673, pages 877 - 886, XP008152989

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.1211622
    - KATRIN SEBASTIAN ET AL, "Signal transduction around thymic stromal lymphopoietin (TSLP) in atopic asthma", CELL COMMUNICATION AND SIGNALING, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20080825), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1186/1478-811X-6-5, ISSN 1478-811X, pages 1 - 8, XP002679189

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1478-811x-6-5
    - SOUMELIS V ET AL, "Human epithelial cells trigger dendritic cell mediated allergic inflammation by producing TSLP", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20020701), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 673 - 680, XP002364946
by applicantWO0017362
 US5985828
    - PANDEY ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 1, pages 59 - 64
    - STODDART ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2000), vol. 175, pages 47 - 58
    - PUEL; LEONARD, CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 12, pages 468 - 473
    - AKASHI ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 12, pages 144 - 150
    - WATANABE ET AL., IMMUNOL. RES., (1999), vol. 20, pages 251 - 259
    - WALDMANN, ANN. ONCOL., (2000), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 101 - 106
    - BEVERLEY; GRUBECK-LOEBENSTEIN, VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 1721 - 1724
    - ASPINALL; ANDREW, VACCINE, (2000), vol. 18, pages 1629 - 1637
    - APPASAMY, CYTOKINES CELL MOL. THER., (1999), vol. 5, pages 25 - 39
    - HOFMEISTER ET AL., CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (1999), vol. 10, pages 41 - 60
    - OR ET AL., CYTOKINES CELL MOL. THER., (1998), vol. 4, pages 287 - 294
    - AKASHI ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1998), vol. 165, pages 13 - 28
    - OFFNER; PLUM, LEUK. LYMPHOMA, (1998), vol. 30, pages 87 - 99
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, CSH PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., Biology, GREENE PUBLISHING ASSOCIATES
    - NEEDLEHAM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453
    - KANEHISA, NUC. ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 203 - 213
    - BEAUCAGE; CARRUTHERS, TETRA. LETTS., (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1862
    - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY
    - VIALLET ET AL., PROGRESS IN GROWTH FACTOR RES., (1989), vol. 1, pages 89 - 97
    - Clinical Immunology: Principles and Practice
    - DEUTSCHER, "Guide to Protein Purification", METH. ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 182
    - HOCHULI, CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, (1989), vol. 12, pages 69 - 70
    - "Purification of Recombinant Proteins with Metal Chelate Absorbent", HOCHULI, Genetic Engineering, Principle and Methods, PLENUM PRESS, (1990), vol. 12, pages 87 - 98
 US19980130972
Opposition   - CHU et al., "IL -33, but not thymic stromal lymphopoietin or IL -25, is central to mite and peanut allergic sensitization", J Allergy Clin Immunol., (20130000), vol. 131, no. 1, pages 187 - 200, XP055271778
    - WYNN, "Type 2 cytokines: mechanisms and therapeutic strategies", Nat Rev Immunol ., (20150500), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 271 - 82, XP055271768

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri3831
    - BORTHWICK et al., "Macrophages are critical to the maintenance of IL -13-dependent lung inflammation and fibrosis", Mucosal Immunol., (20160100), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 38 - 55, XP055271782

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mi.2015.34
    - Stedman's Medical Dictionary;, Baltimore, MD , USA, (20000100), XP026382604
    - Roche Lexikon Medizin, München, Germany, (19990000), XP055271784
    - BLÁZQUEZ et al., "Thymic Stromal Lymphopoietin Is Required for Gastrointestinal Allergy but Not Oral Tolerance", Gastronenterology, (20100000), vol. 139, pages 1301 - 1309, XP027443210

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2010.06.055