Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1397568

EP1397568 - Set of panels comprising an interlocking snap-in profile and method of interlocking the panels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/12]PANELS COMPRISING AN INTERLOCKING SNAP-IN PROFILE
[2007/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firma M. Kaindl
Kaindlstrasse 2
5071 Wals / AT
[2007/34]
Former [2004/12]For all designated states
Firma M. Kaindl
Kaindlstrasse 2
5071 Wals / AT
Inventor(s)01 / MOEBUS, Maik
Mühlbacher Strasse 1
01561 Lampertswalde / DE
02 / Konzelmann, Karl-Heinz
Mühlbacher Strasse 1
01561 Lampertswalde / DE
 [2007/34]
Former [2004/12]01 / MOEBUS, Maik
Mühlbacher Strasse 1
01561 Lampertswalde / DE
02 / Konzelmann, Karl-Heinz
Mühlbacher Strasse 1
01561 Lamperswalde / DE
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01274314.225.10.2001
[2004/12]
WO2001EP12359
Priority number, dateDE2001209840U17.06.2001         Original published format: DE 20109840 U
[2004/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO02103135
Date:27.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1397568
Date:17.03.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002
[2004/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1397568
Date:22.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/04, E04F15/02
[2004/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bausatz aus mehreren Platten mit Einschiebe-Steckprofil und Verfahren zum Verriegeln der Platten[2007/18]
English:Set of panels comprising an interlocking snap-in profile and method of interlocking the panels[2007/18]
French:Jeu de pièces de plaques à profil enfichable et procédé de verrouillage des plaques[2007/18]
Former [2004/12]PLATTEN MIT EINSCHIEBE-STECKPROFIL
Former [2004/12]PANELS COMPRISING AN INTERLOCKING SNAP-IN PROFILE
Former [2004/12]PLAQUES A PROFIL ENFICHABLE
Entry into regional phase11.12.2003National basic fee paid 
11.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/12]
06.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2007Fee for grant paid
11.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE22.11.2007
PT22.01.2008
[2009/33]
Former [2008/28]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
SE22.11.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/25]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
MC31.10.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
Former [2008/10]FI22.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]DE20001788U  (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY]) [A] 1-3,5-7,10-13 * page 11, line 29 - page 17, line 2; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]CH562377  (HEBGEN HEINRICH) [A] 1-6,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 48; figures 1-7 *
ExaminationDE29724428U
by applicantEP0906994
 WO9627721
 DE2502992
 GB1430423
 US5295341
 WO9402699
 EP0843763
 US4426820
 AT405560B
 GB2256023