blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1454998 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1454998



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 520
16.01.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
19.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.12.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
13.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.12.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
07.12.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Opposition 17
07.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
07.12.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Opposition 2
29.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
29.09.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
25.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
21.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
21.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
21.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
10.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
30.03.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
30.03.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
27.03.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.03.2017 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
03.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Request for a change of address - opponent Appeal 1
20.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.02.2017 Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal Appeal 1
15.02.2017 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
15.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
20.12.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
06.12.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.12.2016 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.12.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.09.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
27.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.09.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.11.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
06.11.2015 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.07.2015 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
14.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
22.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.04.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
18.03.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
07.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.02.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
19.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
19.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
19.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
02.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
10.12.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
10.12.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
10.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.12.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.11.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
27.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.10.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
24.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
21.03.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.03.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
25.01.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
11.11.2010 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 7
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
11.11.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.11.2010 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 7
10.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.01.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.10.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.10.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
19.10.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
01.07.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
26.06.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.06.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.06.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
02.10.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.08.2007 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.06.2007 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.06.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2007 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
18.01.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
23.09.2004 Translation of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
28.07.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.07.2004 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.07.2004 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Annex Search / examination 5
17.02.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Description Search / examination 14
17.02.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.02.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.02.2004 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.09.2003 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
19.06.2003 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
19.06.2003 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
19.06.2003 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15