Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1122818

EP1122818 - Gregorian reflector antenna system having a subreflector optimized for an elliptical antenna aperture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Luh, Howard Ho-shou
813 Beaverton Court
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
 [2001/32]
Representative(s)Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/32]Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date01300983.205.02.2001
[2001/32]
Priority number, dateUS2000049905204.02.2000         Original published format: US 499052
[2001/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1122818
Date:08.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1122818
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01Q19/19
[2001/32]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/32]
Former [2001/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gregory Reflektorantenne mit einem optimiertem Subreflektor für eine elliptische Antennenapertur[2001/32]
English:Gregorian reflector antenna system having a subreflector optimized for an elliptical antenna aperture[2001/32]
French:Antenne à réflecteur de type Gregory ayant un réflecteur secondaire optimisé pour une ouverture d'antenne elliptique[2001/32]
Examination procedure09.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
26.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0284883  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5684494  (NATHRATH NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 23; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9617403  (ALENIA SPAZIO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 18, lines 14-19; figure 1 *