Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1134138

EP1134138 - Device for controlling braking force distribution in a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
P.O. Box 404, Whitely Chambers, Don Street St. Helier
Jersey JE4 9WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/38]For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
P.O. Box 404, Whitely Chambers, Don Street
St. Helier, Jersey JE4 9WG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Dunning, Emma-Claire
6 Rosewood Crescent
Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV32 7UN / GB
02 / Fawkes, Paul Antony
6 Aragon House-Tudor Court
Warwick Road, Coventry CV3 6TX / GB
 [2003/28]
Former [2003/22]01 / Dunning, Simon Michael
6 Rosewood Crescent
Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV32 7UN / GB
02 / Fawkes, Paul Antony
6 Aragon House-Tudor Court
Warwick Road, Coventry CV3 6TX / GB
Former [2001/38]01 / Dunning, Simon Michael
6 Rosewood Crescent
Leamington Spa, Warwickshire CV32 7UN / GB
02 / Fawkes, Paul Antony
52 Poitiers Road
Cheylesmore, Coventry CV3 5JX / GB
Representative(s)Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover Patent Department (53G16/4) Banbury Road Lightthorne
Warwickshire CV35 0RG / GB
[2009/40]
Former [2003/42]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover, Patent Department 53G 16/4, Banbury Road, Lighthorne
Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Former [2002/29]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover Patent Department (53W5/12) Warwick Technology Park
Warwick CV34 6RG / GB
Former [2001/38]Wilson, Alan Stuart , et al
Land Rover, Gaydon Engineering Centre, 53/G/9/1, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date01301578.922.02.2001
[2001/38]
Priority number, dateGB2000000598614.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0005986
[2001/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1134138
Date:19.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1134138
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1134138
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/00
[2001/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/23]
Former [2001/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Bremskraftverteilung bei einem Kraftfahrzeug[2001/38]
English:Device for controlling braking force distribution in a motor vehicle[2001/38]
French:Dispositif permettant de commander la répartition de la force de freinage d'un véhicule automobile[2001/38]
Examination procedure03.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
13.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2003Fee for grant paid
26.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19747527  (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPS62299460  ;
 [Y]DE19713561  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * column 2, line 22 - line 58 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880607), vol. 012, no. 195, Database accession no. (M - 705), [Y] 1 * abstract *