Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1130777

EP1130777 - Solid state relay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.2009
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Root 2 Limited
C/o Robson Forth Limited 3 St Davids Business Park Dalgety Bay Dunfermline
Fife KY11 9PF / GB
[2008/21]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Root 2 Limited
New Law House, Saltire Centre
Glenrothes KY6 2DA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Wonfor, Colin
27 Letham Way
Dalgety Bay, Dunfermline KY11 9FQ / GB
 [2001/36]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date01301790.027.02.2001
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateGB2000000461829.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0004618
GB2000002560819.10.2000         Original published format: GB 0025608
[2001/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1130777
Date:05.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1130777
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1130777
Date:02.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/725, H03K17/722, H03K17/79, H03K17/13
[2002/47]
Former International [2001/36]H03K17/725, H03K17/722, H03K17/79
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/36]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterrelais[2001/36]
English:Solid state relay[2001/36]
French:Relais à semi-conducteurs[2001/36]
Examination procedure17.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2008Fee for grant paid
07.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
CY02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
TR02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
GR03.10.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
IE27.02.2009
LU27.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
GR03.10.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
IE27.02.2009
LU27.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/47]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
GR03.10.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
IE27.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/09]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
SE02.10.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
IE27.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/07]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
IE27.02.2009
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/47]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
CH28.02.2009
LI28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/42]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/19]AT02.07.2008
BE02.07.2008
DK02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT02.07.2008
FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI02.07.2008
NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL02.07.2008
ES13.10.2008
PT02.12.2008
Former [2009/01]NL02.07.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2062372  (PLESSEY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 1, line 98 - page 2, line 41; figure 1 *;
 [XA]DE4313882  (ELECTROMATIC IND A S [DK]) [X] 17 * column 6, line 16 - column 7, line 48; figures 1-3 * [A] 18;
 [XA]WO0008740  (LEXEL FINLAND AB OY [FI], et al) [X] 17 * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 29; figures 1-6 * [A] 18;
 [A]DE4026679  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *