Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1129943

EP1129943 - Controller and control method for satellite orbit-keeping maneuvers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way Palo Alto
California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]For all designated states
Space Systems / Loral, Inc.
3825 Fabian Way
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Higham, John S.
1565 Lloyd Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / Reckdahl, Keith
256 Edlee Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
 [2001/36]
Representative(s)Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]Greene, Simon Kenneth , et al
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date01301937.702.03.2001
[2001/36]
Priority number, dateUS2000051703202.03.2000         Original published format: US 517032
[2001/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1129943
Date:05.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1129943
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/26, B64G1/28, G05D1/08
[2002/46]
Former International [2001/36]B64G1/26, B64G1/28
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/31]
Former [2001/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuerungsvorrichtung und -verfahren für Satellitenpositionshaltemanöver[2001/36]
English:Controller and control method for satellite orbit-keeping maneuvers[2001/36]
French:Controleur et méthode de contrôle pour manoeuvres de maintien d'orbite d'un satellite[2001/36]
Examination procedure09.07.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH02212298  ;
 [A]WO9849058  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,8-10 * page 1, line 15 - line 35 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 17 *;
 [A]EP0780299  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-6,8-13 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901113), vol. 014, no. 514, Database accession no. (M - 1046), [Y] 1-4,8-11 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SUZUKI T, YASUDA K, YOSHIKAWA S, YAMADA K, YOSHIDA N, "An application of fuzzy algorithm to thruster control system of spacecraft", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 19TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SPACE TECHNOLOGY AND SCIENCE, Tokyo, Japan, (1994), pages 303 - 310, XP001113103 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * page 303, column 2, line 21 - line 30 * * page 304, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 3; figure 2 * * page 305, column 1, line 20 *
by applicantUS5400252
 US5349532
 US4537375
 US20000531704