Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239444

EP1239444 - Liquid crystal display device and method for driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Adachi, Katsumi
7-8-10, Mamigaoka
Kashiba-shi, Nara 639-0223 / JP
02 / Yamakura, Makoto
2-2-2-619, Minamiterakatakitadori
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0046 / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date01302046.606.03.2001
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1239444
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36
[2002/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung und Ansteuerungsverfahren dafür[2002/37]
English:Liquid crystal display device and method for driving the same[2002/37]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides et son procédé de commande[2002/37]
Examination procedure24.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
01.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
07.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0622655  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-15,17-21 * column 21, line 21 - column 22, line 42; figures 12,19 * [Y] 4,5,16,22,23;
 [Y]US5706023  (NAGATA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,22,23 * column 3, line 55 - column 8, line 17 *;
 [YA]EP0241562  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 16 * page 14, line 13 - page 16, line 23; figure 5 * [A] 6-8;
 [A]US5686932  (TOMITA SATORU [JP]) [A] 10,18 * column 6, line 33 - column 13, line 63; figure 10 *