Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1137298

EP1137298 - Power management system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.06.2011  [2011/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT & T Laboratories Cambridge Limited
24a Trumpington Street
Cambridge CB2 1QA / GB
[2001/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Osborn, Paul Anthony
2 Elizabeth Way
Colne, Huntingdon PE28 3PH / GB
 [2001/39]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/45]Asquith, Julian Peter , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2001/39]Robson, Aidan John
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date01302665.322.03.2001
[2001/39]
Priority number, dateGB2000000698022.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0006980
[2001/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1137298
Date:26.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1137298
Date:29.12.2004
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, H04L12/56
[2004/39]
Former International [2001/39]H04Q7/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/39]
TitleGerman:Leistungssteuerungssystem[2001/39]
English:Power management system[2001/39]
French:Système de gestion de puisance[2001/39]
Examination procedure28.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/34]
27.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/23]
07.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/23]
Divisional application(s)EP07023349.9  / EP1906295
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US5585745  (SIMMONS LAURA E [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 16; figures 1,4-6 * * column 8, lines 25-32 *;
 [A]EP0676686  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 41; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5754883  (LIM JUNG-GYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5900026  (RYU CHANG-HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-8 * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 51; figure 5 *