Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1138962

EP1138962 - Resilient clip fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Newfrey LLC
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423, Kirkwood Highway
Neward, Delaware 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
Newfrey LLC
Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
Former [2002/27]For all designated states
EMHART LLC
Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
EMHART INC.
Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway
Newark, Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lubera, Daniel J.
15844 Orchard Lane
Roseville, Michigan 48066 / US
02 / Siudym II, Jacob A.
13131 Imlay City Road
Emmett, Michigan 48022 / US
03 / Osterland, Robert
5740 Belleview, East China Township
St. Clair, Michigan 48054 / US
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn , et al
haarpatent
Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer
Goethestraße 2
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn , et al
Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Former [2002/43]Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Karlstrasse 23
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Former [2002/33]Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker, Patent Department 210 Bath Road
Berks, Slough SL1 3YD / GB
Former [2001/40]Harries, Simon George , et al
Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road
Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date01302742.026.03.2001
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateUS20000192375P27.03.2000         Original published format: US 192375 P
US2001081359221.03.2001         Original published format: US 813592
[2003/05]
Former [2001/40]US20000192375P27.03.2000
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1138962
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1138962
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16B37/04, F16B37/02, F16B5/06, B60R13/02, B60R21/20
[2002/45]
Former International [2001/40]F16B37/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2003/30]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Federbefestigungsclip[2001/40]
English:Resilient clip fastener[2001/40]
French:Elément de retenue à attache élastique[2001/40]
Examination procedure22.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
27.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
18.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4595325  (MORAN THOMAS M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,27-29,31-33,35 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 54 * * figure - *;
 [XA]EP0930440  (CALIFORNIA IND PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-8,26-28,31,32,35,36 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 33 * * figure - * [A] 25;
 [X]US2426799  (TINNERMAN GEORGE A) [X] 1,3-5,7-11,23,24,27-29,31-33,35 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3400743  (JOHN STRANGE) [X] 1-5,7,8,12-14,27-29,31-33,35 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1229668  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.) [A] 15 * page 2, column R, line 110 - line 127 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]US4300865  (MURRAY RONALD A) [X] 1-5,27,29,31-33,35,37-42,44 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 10 * * figure - *;
 [X]US4865505  (OKADA SHIGEO [JP]) [X] 45-49 * column 3, line 4 - line 22 * * figure - *;
 [X]US5992914  (GOTOH YOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 45-49 * column 3, line 19 - line 47 * * figures 3-5 *;
 [XA]US5857735  (ALONSO CUESTA JERONIMO [ES]) [X] 1-5,27-29,31-33,35 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 6 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 31 * * figures 1-4,8A-9C * [A] 15,30,34