Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1145748

EP1145748 - Game device, game device control method and information storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2010  [2010/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd.
9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8324 / JP
[2008/18]
Former [2003/33]For all designated states
Konami Corporation
4-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
Konami Corporation
3-1, Toranomon 4-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oe, Osamu
c/o KCE Studios Inc, 4-3-1, Kita-7jonishi, Kita-ku
Sapporo / JP
02 / Takehara, kazuyoshi
c/o KCE Studios Inc, 4-3-1, Kita-7jonishi, Kita-ku
Sapporo / JP
03 / Tanimura, Akihide
c/o KCE Studios Inc, 4-3-1, Kita-7jonishi, Kita-ku
Sapporo / JP
04 / Majima, Yasukazu
c/o KCE Studios Inc, 4-3-1, Kita-7jonishi, Kita-ku
Sapporo / JP
 [2001/42]
Representative(s)Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/42]Bucks, Teresa Anne , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date01302872.528.03.2001
[2001/42]
Priority number, dateJP2000011379714.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000113797
[2001/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1145748
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1145748
Date:15.10.2003
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10, A63F13/12
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/28]
Former [2001/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spielvorrichtung, Spielvorrichtungkontrollverfahren und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium[2001/42]
English:Game device, game device control method and information storage medium[2001/42]
French:Appareil de jeu, méthode de contrôle pour appareil de jeu et support d'enregistrement d'informations[2001/42]
Examination procedure23.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
13.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/21]
08.01.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search