Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1138933

EP1138933 - Method and apparatus for determining the extent of wear of a fuel pump forming part of a fuelling system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
Stratford Road, Solihull
West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
Lucas Industries Limited
Stratford Road, Solihull
West Midlands B90 4LA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Yates, Martin Kenneth
21 Church Lane, East Haddon
Northants NN6 8DB / GB
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Hopley, Joanne Selina
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway, Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Pople, Joanne Selina
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street
Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date01303009.329.03.2001
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateGB2000000758330.03.2000         Original published format: GB 0007583
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1138933
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1138933
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/00
[2001/40]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/21]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auswertung des Abnutzungsgrades einer Brennstoffpumpe in einem Brennstoffversorgungssystem[2001/40]
English:Method and apparatus for determining the extent of wear of a fuel pump forming part of a fuelling system[2001/40]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour évaluer le degré d'usure d'une pompe à carburant dans un système d'alimentation en carburant[2001/40]
Examination procedure05.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
04.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0388046  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - column 6, line 24 *;
 [A]EP0785358  (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - line 40 * * column 2, line 28 - column 5, line 57 *;
 [A]US5770796  (SAKAMOTO ATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line L * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, line 36 - column 10, line 23 *;
 [A]DE2937103  (KRAFTWERK UNION AG) [A] 1 * figure - * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 36 *;
 [A]US3465777  (THORBURN DAVID H) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - line 46 * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 22 *;
 [A]EP0693647  (PLEIGER PAUL [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 4 - line 34 *;
 [A]US4205702  (SILVERWATER BERNARD F [US]) [A] * abstract * * column 8, line 9 - column 10, line 38 *;
 [A]DE19830619  (KRONTEC MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 60 *;
 [A]DE3619147  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - line 32 * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 41 *