Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1209940

EP1209940 - Method and system for UMTS packet transmission scheduling on uplink channels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/22]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gruhl, Stefan
Schlossaeckerstr. 24a
Nuremberg 90443 / DE
02 / Mueckenheim, Jens
Flataustrasse 57
Nuremberg 90411 / DE
 [2002/22]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2002/22]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Limted, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date01303126.502.04.2001
[2002/22]
Priority number, dateEP2000031034322.11.2000         Original published format: EP 00310343
EP2000031034422.11.2000         Original published format: EP 00310344
[2002/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1209940
Date:29.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2002/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/08]
Former [2002/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Ablaufsteuerung der Versendung von UMTS-Paketen auf Aufwärtskanäle[2002/22]
English:Method and system for UMTS packet transmission scheduling on uplink channels[2002/22]
French:Procédé et système pour l'ordonnancement de la transmission de paquets UMTS dans des canaux montants[2002/22]
Examination procedure16.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
30.11.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.04.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, SE
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/26]
22.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.01.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.01.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0033589  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY ;SALONEN JANNE (FI); HONKASALO ZHI CHUN (FI)) [A] 1,20 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 2 * * page 11, line 16 - line 22 * * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 23 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]WO9845966  (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1,20 * page 43, line 21 - page 45, line 8 * * figure 11 *