Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1152571

EP1152571 - Two-way resource reservation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/45]Two-way packet data protocol for a mobile telecommunication system
[2005/31]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Xiaobao X.
17 Beech Drive
Swindon, SN5 5DQ / GB
02 / Chuah, Mooi Choo
1 Skylark Court
Marlboro, New Jersey 07746 / US
 [2001/45]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2001/45]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date01303693.423.04.2001
[2001/45]
Priority number, dateUS2000056551005.05.2000         Original published format: US 565510
[2001/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1152571
Date:07.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1152571
Date:21.05.2003
[2003/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1152571
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/56, H04L29/06
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/07]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bidirektionales Reservierungsprotokoll[2005/31]
English:Two-way resource reservation[2005/31]
French:Réservation de ressources bidirectionnelles[2005/31]
Former [2001/45]Zweiweg-Paketdatenprotokoll für ein mobiles Übertragungssystem
Former [2001/45]Two-way packet data protocol for a mobile telecommunication system
Former [2001/45]Protocole bidirectionel pour paquets de données pour un système de télécommunication mobile
Examination procedure11.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2005Fee for grant paid
22.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0010357  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY ;HAUMONT SERGE (FI); NIEMELAE TUOMAS (FI); PUUSK) [Y] 2-4,6-18 * page 9, line 30 - page 12, line 8 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 2 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 19 * * page 18, line 25 - page 19, line 3 * * figures 3-6 *;
 [XY]  - ERIKSSON A, "REAL-TIME SERVICES OVER THE INTERNET", ISS '97. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM). GLOBAL NETWORK EVOLUTION: CONVERGENCE OR COLLISION? TORONTO, SEPT. 21 - 26, 1997, ISS. WORLD TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONGRESS. (INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM), TORONTO, P, (19970921), vol. 2, pages 173 - 179, XP000704466 [X] 1,5,19,20 * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [02.7] * * figure 3 * [Y] 2-4,6-18
 [A]  - BRADEN R ET AL, "RFC 2205: Resource ReSerVation Protocol (RSVP) - Version 1 Functional Specification", (199709), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc2205.txt?number=2205, (20020702), XP002204209 [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0001] , [INTRODUCTION] *