Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160913

EP1160913 - Antenna system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
15.02.2003Change - representativepublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Widley, Chris
18 Manland Way
Harpenden / GB
02 / Kokkos, Assimakis
10 Rutland Gate
Maidenhead / GB
03 / MacNamara, Ian
2 Ledron Close
Reading / GB
04 / Itkonen, Jarkko
6 Barnard Close
Camberley / GB
05 / Ojanen, Pekka
Maksalahdentie
19131 Espoo / FI
06 / Einola, Heikki
Hihtäjäntie 8A15
Helsinki / FI
07 / Vivlavaara, Asko
Otavatie 3A16
Helsinki / FI
08 / Rantalainen, Timo
Meripuistotie 4A7
Helsinki / FI
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam
Nokia IPR Department
Nokia House
Summit Avenue
Farnborough, Hants. GU14 0NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Khan, Mohamed Saiful Azam
Nokia IPR Department Nokia House Summit Avenue
Farnborough, Hants. GU14 0NG / GB
Former [2001/49]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date01303741.124.04.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateGB2000001322931.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0013229
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1160913
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1160913
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/28, H01Q3/26, H01Q25/00, H04B7/185
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Antennensystem[2001/49]
English:Antenna system[2001/49]
French:Système d'antenne[2001/49]
Examination procedure31.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/14]
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0987837  (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1,7-9,14-16 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 10 - column 3, paragraph 18; figures 1A-7 * * column 6, paragraph 33 - column 7 * [Y] 2-6,10-13;
 [Y]US6058318  (KOBAYAKAWA SHUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-6,10-13 * abstract *;
 [X]US5790071  (SILVERSTEIN SETH DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,14-16 * column 3, line 58 - column 5, line 10 *;
 [X]US5175556  (BERKOWITZ MILTON [US]) [X] 1,7-9,14-16 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 32; figure . *;
 [A]WO0024082  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4809006  (DAR TARIQ B [US]) [A] 1,7-9,14-16 * abstract *