EP1154342 - System and method for take-off of materials using two-dimensional cad interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states El-con System Co., Ltd. 3F. Seocho Town Building, 1521-2 Seocho 3-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-871 / KR | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pyoung-Young, Jung 804-501 Dungchon 8-Danji Jukong Apt., 707 Dungchon Kangseo-gu, Seoul 157-030 / KR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01303770.0 | 25.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | KR20000022614 | 27.04.2000 Original published format: KR 2000022614 | KR20000057700 | 30.09.2000 Original published format: KR 2000057700 | KR20000057701 | 30.09.2000 Original published format: KR 2000057701 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1154342 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1154342 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4097, E04G23/08 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
G05B19/4097 (EP,US);
G06F30/13 (EP,US);
G06F2111/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | G05B19/4097 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/09] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für Materialabnahme mit einer zwei-dimensionalen CAD-Schnittstelle | [2001/46] | English: | System and method for take-off of materials using two-dimensional cad interface | [2001/46] | French: | Système et méthode d'enlèvement de matériau utilisant une interface CAD bidimensionnelle | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5761674 (ITO KENJI [JP]) [X] 1,7,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11165160 ; | [A]JPH10334135 ; | [A]JPH11311023 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11165160 A 19990622 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,7,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10334135 A 19981218 (SEKISUI HOUSE LTD) [A] 1,7,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11311023 A 19991109 (SEKISUI HOUSE LTD) [A] 1,7,10,11 * abstract * |