Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1152302

EP1152302 - Humidity control in a copying device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, NY 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ayash, Karl B.
1060 Hrezent View Lane
Webster, NY 14580 / US
02 / Hollar, Thomas C.
11 Highland Drive
Penfield, NY 14526 / US
03 / Dergham, Ali R.
25 Woodland Park
Rochester, NY 14610 / US
04 / Redden, David N.
27 Valley Green Circle
Penfield, NY 14526-1719 / US
05 / Steele, John H.
681 Stony Point Road
Spencerport, NY 14559 / US
 [2001/45]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/20]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2001/45]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01303817.926.04.2001
[2001/45]
Priority number, dateUS20000200807P01.05.2000         Original published format: US 200807 P
US2000071499420.11.2000         Original published format: US 714994
[2001/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1152302
Date:07.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1152302
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/20
[2001/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/09]
Former [2001/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Feuchtigkeitsregelung in einer Kopiervorrichtung[2001/45]
English:Humidity control in a copying device[2001/45]
French:Régulation d'humidité dans un dispositif à copier[2001/45]
Examination procedure04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
16.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/16]
06.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201717   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0629931  (XEIKON NV [BE]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 25; figures 1,4 * [A] 2,4,6,9,10;
 [X]JPH0519581  ;
 [X]JPH08335025  ;
 [A]JPH03193372
 [X]  - C. D. WILSON, "Air conditioning of xerographic reproductions machines", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, Stamford, Conn., US, (197607), vol. 1, no. 7, page 69, XP002221328 [X] 1,3 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930604), vol. 017, no. 293, Database accession no. (P - 1550), [X] 1,3 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, [X] 11 * abstract *
 [A]  - XEROX CORPORATION, "Pressurized and filtered xerographic system", RESEARH DISCLOSURE, Hampshire, GB, (197512), pages 50 - 51, XP002221148 [A] 1,5-7,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911118), vol. 015, no. 452, Database accession no. (M - 1180), [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *
by applicantUS5144366
 US5206754
 EP0629931
 JPH0519581
 JPH08335025
 JPH03193372
    - C. D. WILSON, "Air conditioning of xerographic reproductions machines", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, (197607), vol. 1, no. 7, page 69,
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930604), vol. 017, no. 293,
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04,
    - XEROX CORPORATION, "Pressurized and filtered xerographic system", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (197512), pages 50 - 51,
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911118), vol. 015, no. 452,