Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254644

EP1254644 - Variable form stent and deployment arrangement for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.12.2003
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pan Medical Limited
Seaford House, Barrie Road, Hillington Industrial Estate
Glasgow G52 4PX / GB
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Nasralla, Max
The Oaks, Cleeve Hill Road
Gloucestershire, Cheltenham GL52 3NU / GB
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Bailey, Richard Alan
A.R. Davies & Co.
27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham
Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Bailey, Richard Alan
A.R. Davies & Co., 27 Imperial Square
Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB
Application number, filing date01303996.101.05.2001
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254644
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06, A61M25/10
[2002/45]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/30]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stent mit einer variablen Form und Anordnung zu seiner Entfaltung[2002/45]
English:Variable form stent and deployment arrangement for use therewith[2002/45]
French:Stent déformable et arrangement pour le déployer[2002/45]
Examination procedure07.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/07]
09.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/07]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6120534  (RUIZ CARLOS E [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 5;
 [X]US5632762  (MYLER RICHARD K [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 6, line 12 - line 47; figures 1,2,7,8 *;
 [XA]WO0053122  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 5 - page 17, line 13; figure -; claim - * [A] 5,6