Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159991

EP1159991 - Game card and game system using a game machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NINTENDO CO., LTD.
11-1, Hokotate-cho
Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto / JP
For all designated states
Creatures Inc.
Kawasaki Teitoku Bldg. Bekkan, 3-2-5 Nihonbashi Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Limited
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba, Minami-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
For all designated states
Creatures Inc.
Kawasaki Teitoku Bldg. Bekkan, 3-2-5 Nihonbashi
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-0027 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishihara, Tsunekazu
3rd Floor, Kawasaki Teitoku Building Bekkan
3-2-5, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Tanimura, Masayoshi c/o Hal Laboratory Inc.
1999-9, Ryuoshinmachi, Ryuou-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP
 [2002/16]
Former [2001/49]01 / Ishihara, Tsunekazu
3-2-5, Nihonbashi
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Tanimura, Masayoshi c/o Hal Laboratory Inc.
1999-9, Ryuoshinmachi, Ryuou-cho
Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP
Representative(s)Perkins, Sarah
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Perkins, Sarah
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
Application number, filing date01304639.625.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateJP2000015875429.05.2000         Original published format: JP 2000158754
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159991
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1159991
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/02
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/12]
Former [2004/09](deleted) 
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spielkarte und Spielsystem mit Spielvorrichtung[2001/49]
English:Game card and game system using a game machine[2001/49]
French:Carte de jeu et système de jeu utilisant un appareil de jeu[2001/49]
Examination procedure02.12.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/12]
22.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/43]
07.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5411259  (PEARSON CARL P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,12,13,15,16,21,24 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 22 - line 63 * [A] 3,4,10,11,22,23,25 [Y] 6,8,14;
 [YA]EP0988875  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0077] * [A] 26,27;
 [YA]US5959281  (DOMITEAUX MARK R [US]) [Y] 8,14 * column 5, line 16 - line 42 * [A] 19,20;
 [A]JPH0962812  ;
 []US6200216  (PEPPEL TYLER [US]) [ ] * column 9, line 20 - line 22 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 21 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 07, [A] 6,8,14,19,20 * abstract *