Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160714

EP1160714 - System and method enabling remote access to and customization of multimedia [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.06.2009  [2009/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comverse Network Systems, Ltd.
29 Habarzel Street, Ramat Hachayal
Tel-Aviv 69710 / IL
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Comverse Network Systems, Ltd.
29 Habarzel Street, Ramat Hachayal
Tel-Aviv 69710 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Emodi, Dan
4/11 Meridor Street
Tel Aviv 69411 / IL
02 / Zevadi, Michael
35 Bernstein-Cohen Street
Ramat-Hasharon 47213 / IL
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Driver, Virginia Rozanne , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date01304641.225.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateUS20000207194P26.05.2000         Original published format: US 207194 P
US2000064853228.08.2000         Original published format: US 648532
US2001086153122.05.2001         Original published format: US 861531
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1160714
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/35]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zum Fernzugriff auf Multimedia-Daten und zu deren Anpassung[2001/49]
English:System and method enabling remote access to and customization of multimedia[2001/49]
French:Système et procédé permettant l'accès à distance et la personnalisation d'information multimedia[2001/49]
Examination procedure05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
12.06.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/25]
30.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search