Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164245

EP1164245 - Window characteristic mapping for object detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.04.2009  [2009/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC
2135 West Maple Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
[2006/12]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
Meritor Light Vehicle Technology, LLC
2135 West Maple Road
Troy, Michigan 48084 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tyckowski, Joseph
111 Tecumseh
Clawson, Michigan 48017 / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Foot, Paul Matthew James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
Greater London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/02]Foot, Paul Matthew James , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2001/51]Jones, John Bryn , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date01305227.915.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateUS2000059626116.06.2000         Original published format: US 596261
[2001/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164245
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164245
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/00, H02H7/085
[2001/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/10]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kennfelddatenbestimmung eines Fensters zur Hinderniserkennung[2001/51]
English:Window characteristic mapping for object detection[2001/51]
French:Détermination de données de diagramme d'une vitre pour contrôle d'obstruction[2001/51]
Examination procedure14.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/03]
12.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/14]
14.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6064165  (BOISVERT MARIO P [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * claims 1,2,19-21 *