Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1187380

EP1187380 - Method and system for on-demand transmission of broadcast data to mobile receivers using unused transmission channels in a wireless cellular communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Command Audio Corporation
101 Redwood Shores Parkway
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
[2002/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Wegener, Albert W.
229 Corte Madera Road
Portola Valley, CA 94025 / US
 [2002/11]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2002/11]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date01306237.719.07.2001
[2002/11]
Priority number, dateUS2000063003901.08.2000         Original published format: US 630039
[2002/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1187380
Date:13.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1187380
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1187380
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00, H04Q7/36
[2002/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/22]
Former [2002/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System für die Übertragung auf Anfrage von Rundfunkdaten an mobilen Empfängern mit Verwendung von ungebrauchten Übertragungskanälen in einem zellularen Funkkommunikationssystem[2002/11]
English:Method and system for on-demand transmission of broadcast data to mobile receivers using unused transmission channels in a wireless cellular communication system[2002/11]
French:Méthode et système pour la distribution de données à la demande vers des récepteurs mobiles utilisant des canaux de transmission inutilisés dans un système de communication radiophonique cellulaire[2002/11]
Examination procedure05.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/11]
05.09.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
13.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2004Fee for grant paid
04.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5585850  (SCHWALLER JOHN [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9,13 * column A * * column 1, line 19 - line 22 * * column 4, line 36 - line 40 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 59 * * column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 18 * [Y] 2-4,10-12,14-17;
 [YA]EP0944275  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,10-12,14-17 * column A * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 15 * * column 6, line 37 - line 45 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 10 * * column 7, line 22 - line 32 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 49 * * column 14, line 10 - line 41 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 1,9,13;
 [A]JP2000183834
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, [A] 1,9,13,15,17 * abstract *