Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1176071

EP1176071 - Wiper rubber location [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trico Products Corporation
3255 West Hamlin Road
Rochester Hills, MI 48309 / US
[2002/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Robertson, Alistair Duncan
4 Brecon Place, Aberaman
Aberdare, Mid Glamorgan CF44 6RP / GB
02 / Davies, Phillip
30 Stafford Road
Griffithstown, Torfaen NP4 5LQ / GB
 [2002/05]
Representative(s)Britter, Keith Palmer
Britter & Co.
Enterprise House
14b Whitehorse Street
Baldock
Hertfordshire SG7 6QN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Britter, Keith Palmer
Britter & Co. Enterprise House 14b Whitehorse Street
Baldock Hertfordshire SG7 6QN / GB
Former [2002/05]James, Michael John Gwynne , et al
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James, 33, St. Mary Street
Cardiff CF10 1AF / GB
Application number, filing date01306479.527.07.2001
[2002/05]
Priority number, dateGB2000001845528.07.2000         Original published format: GB 0018455
[2002/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1176071
Date:30.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1176071
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60S1/38
[2002/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2003/23]
Former [2002/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Position eines Wischergummis[2002/05]
English:Wiper rubber location[2002/05]
French:Positionnement de caoutchouc d'essuie-glace[2002/05]
Examination procedure12.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
19.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
04.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2004Fee for grant paid
26.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
09.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4009503  (SHARP BERNARD C) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, lines 50-55; figure 2 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 27; figures 2-5 * [Y] 6;
 [YA]US4177538  (BLAIKLOCK WILLIAM M [CA], et al) [Y] 6 * column 5, lines 2-17; figure 7 * * column 4, lines 41-64 * [A] 1-5;
 [XA]US4566147  (BAERENWALD PHILIP M [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, lines 36-64; figures 4,5,7 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 12 * [A] 4